Johnson v. Hamilton County Government et al
Plaintiff: Angel Cherie Johnson
Defendant: C.P.S. a minor child through parent and next friend Angel Cherie Johnson, Tyler Shane McRae, Hamilton County Government and Daniel Wilkey
Case Number: 1:2019cv00329
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 21 Defendant Tyler McRae's ANSWER to Complaint by Tyler Shane McRae(Deputy, in his capacity as a deputy sheriff for Hamilton County Government), Tyler Shane McRae(in his individual capacity).(Tidwell, W)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER of REASSIGNMENT. To more efficiently utilize the Court's time and resources, Case Nos. 1:19-cv-198-DCLC-SKL, 1:19-cv-304-HSM-CHS, and 1:19-cv-00305-PLR-CHS are hereby REASSIGNED to United States District Judge Travis R. McDonough, and United States Magistrate Christopher H. Steger, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and the Rules of this Court. Signed by Chief District Judge Pamela L Reeves on January 6, 2020. (AYB)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting in part and denying in part #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting in part and denying in part #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 12/23/19. (KFB)
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger: Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2019 re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Daniel Wilkey. (Tape #Digital Recording 1B) (KFB)
December 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer : Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1B - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger. (KMG)
December 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Tyler Shane McRae(Deputy, in his capacity as a deputy sheriff for Hamilton County Government). (Tidwell, W)
December 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by W Gerald Tidwell, Jr on behalf of Tyler Shane McRae(Deputy, in his capacity as a deputy sheriff for Hamilton County Government) (Tidwell, W)
December 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hamilton County Government. (Milling, Sharon)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Case Coversheet by Hamilton County Government, Tyler Shane McRae(Deputy, in his capacity as a deputy sheriff for Hamilton County Government), Tyler Shane McRae(in his individual capacity). (Milling, Sharon)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer : Motion Hearing set for 12/6/19 is RESCHEDULED for 12/20/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1B - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger. (KMG)
December 1, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Stay , #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Angel Cherie Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEFENDANT TYLER MCRAE FACEBOOK COMMENTS TO WTVC CHANNEL 9)(Flores, Robin)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond by Hamilton County Government, Tyler Shane McRae(Deputy, in his capacity as a deputy sheriff for Hamilton County Government), Tyler Shane McRae(in his individual capacity). (Milling, Sharon)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer : Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1B - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger. (KMG)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Stay filed by Daniel Wilkey(in his individual capacity), Daniel Wilkey(Deputy, in his capacity as a deputy sheriff for Hamilton County Government). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Newspaper Article, #2 Exhibit 2 - Newspaper Article)(Guster, James)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay by Daniel Wilkey(in his individual capacity), Daniel Wilkey(Deputy, in his capacity as a deputy sheriff for Hamilton County Government). (Guster, James)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Daniel Wilkey(in his individual capacity), Daniel Wilkey(Deputy, in his capacity as a deputy sheriff for Hamilton County Government). (Guster, James)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/18/2019. (AMP)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/18/2019. (AMP)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/18/2019. (AMP)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel: Please file a signed and dated Civil Cover Sheet using the event Supplement under Other Documents and link it to the Notice of Removal. Requirements due by 11/25/2019. (AMP)
November 18, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (AMP)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Hamilton County, Tennessee, case number 19 C 1161. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4133238), filed by Hamilton County Government, Tyler Shane McRae, Daniel Wilkey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint & Summonses, #2 Exhibit B - Second Amended Complaint)(Milling, Sharon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Hamilton County Government et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.P.S. a minor child through parent and next friend Angel Cherie Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Shane McRae
Represented By: Sharon McMullan Milling
Represented By: W Gerald Tidwell, Jr
Represented By: R Dee Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton County Government
Represented By: Sharon McMullan Milling
Represented By: R Dee Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Wilkey
Represented By: Sharon McMullan Milling
Represented By: James Micah Guster
Represented By: R Dee Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Cherie Johnson
Represented By: Robin R Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?