Price v. U.S Department of Veteran Affairs
Plaintiff: Sandee Kay Price
Defendant: Veterans Affairs, Department of and U.S Department of Veteran Affairs
Case Number: 1:2019cv00355
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney J. Allen Hammontree on behalf of Sandee Kay Price(Personal Representative of Don Edward Price, Deceased. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 12/23/2019. (KRS)
December 16, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4159019.) filed by Sandee Kay Price as to Sandee Kay Price(Personal Representative of Don Edward Price, Deceased), Sandee Kay Price(Individually) (BDG)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4159019.) by Sandee Kay Price(Personal Representative of Don Edward Price, Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Hammontree, J.)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by Sandee Kay Price(Personal Representative of Don Edward Price, Deceased). (Hammontree, J.)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney J. Allen Hammontree is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (BDG)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/11/2019. (BDG)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/11/2019. (BDG)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/11/2019. (BDG)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S Department of Veteran Affairs. (BDG)
December 11, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (BDG)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint, :Please for your motion for Pro Hac Vice with certificates of good standing separately. i.e. Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Motions Appear Pro Hac Vice. Please supplement complaint with Civil Cover Sheet. Civil Events Other Filings Other DocumentsSupplement. requirements due by 12/16/2019. (BDG)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4154259.), filed by Sandee Kay Price. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Defendant, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Compliance with Notices, #3 Other Plaintiff'sCertificate of Good Faith, #4 Other Pro Hac Request)(Hammontree, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. U.S Department of Veteran Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandee Kay Price
Represented By: J. Allen Hammontree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veterans Affairs, Department of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S Department of Veteran Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?