Brown v. Selective Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Randall R. Brown
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00364
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Uhorchuk, Robert)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CONSENT to Magistrate by Selective Insurance Company of America (Uhorchuk, Robert)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court after a telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: 1. As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer,in a conference arranged by plaintiffs counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent/Nonconsent)(JCK)
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Selective Insurance Company of America.(Uhorchuk, Robert)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 12/20/2019. (BJL)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge M Clifton L Corker on 12/20/2019. (BJL)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 12/20/2019. (BJL)
December 19, 2019 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (BJL)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT Cover Sheet by Selective Insurance Company of America. (Uhorchuk, Robert)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Selective Insurance Company of America. (Uhorchuk, Robert) Modified on 12/20/2019 (BJL). Added Corporate Parent - Selective Insurance Group, Inc. to Selective Insurance Company of America Role - dft
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4166995), filed by Selective Insurance Company of America.(Uhorchuk, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Selective Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall R. Brown
Represented By: Terrance Lloyd Jones
Represented By: Buddy B Presley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Michael J Vetter, Sr
Represented By: Robert J Uhorchuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?