Shred Pro Secure, LLC v. Healthcare Waste Management (TV1)
Plaintiff: SHRED PRO SECURE, LLC
Defendant: HEALTHCARE WASTE MANAGEMENT d/b/a SHREDPRO and Healthcare Waste Management doing business as ShredPro
Case Number: 1:2020cv00148
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael R Collins by Healthcare Waste Management, Inc. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 07/31/2020. (KRS)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Entire Court Record served on Peter Lindemulder, III, Registered Agent and Secretary on 07/13/2020, filed by Shred Pro Secure, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Return Receipt for Service Package, #2 Exhibit B Summons Issued to Healthcare Waste Management Inc. d/b/a SHREDPRO)(Jackson, John)
July 29, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Healthcare Waste Management (JBR)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael R Collins (Filing fee $90.00, Receipt #K3040727) by Healthcare Waste Management. (JBR)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Healthcare Waste Management. (AWS)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint,, Summons by Shred Pro Secure, LLC. (Jackson, John)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 06/12/2020. (AMP)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 06/12/2020. (AMP)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 06/12/2020. (AMP)
June 12, 2020 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Healthcare Waste Management. (AMP)
June 12, 2020 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AMP)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 PATENT AND TRADEMARK NOTICE in compliance with 35 USC 290 and/or 15 USC 1116 regarding 5,239,751 . (Jackson, John)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by SHRED PRO SECURE, LLC. (Jackson, John)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Federal Trademark Infringement and Unfair Competition, Common Law Trademark Infringement and Unfair Competition, and Violations of the Tennessee Consumer Protection Act against HEALTHCARE WASTE MANAGEMENT d/b/a SHREDPRO ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4372955.), filed by SHRED PRO SECURE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Registration Certificate for Plaintiff's Mark, #3 Exhibit 2 - Samples of Plaintiff's Use of Its Mark, #4 Exhibit 3 - Defendant's Website, #5 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Cease & Desist Letter)(Jackson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shred Pro Secure, LLC v. Healthcare Waste Management (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTHCARE WASTE MANAGEMENT d/b/a SHREDPRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Waste Management doing business as ShredPro
Represented By: Michael R Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHRED PRO SECURE, LLC
Represented By: John G Jackson
Represented By: Stephen D Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?