World Debt Acquisitions, LLC v. Arch Specialty Insurance Company (TV1)
Plaintiff: World Debt Acquisitions, LLC
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00201
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Erin McDaniel on behalf of Arch Specialty Insurance Company. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 09/01/2020. (KRS) Modified on 9/2/2020 Serviced to Erin McDaniel. (AWS)
August 31, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (AWS)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Elkin, Julie-Karel)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION For Initial Extension Of Time For Defendant To Respond To Complaint by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Elkin, Julie-Karel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie-Karel Elkin on behalf of All Defendants (Elkin, Julie-Karel)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed. (AWS)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by World Debt Acquisitions, LLC. Arch Specialty Insurance Company served on 7/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Bobbitt, Jonathan)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on July 17, 2020. (AYB)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on July 17, 2020. (AYB)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on July 17, 2020. (AYB)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (AYB)
July 17, 2020 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AYB)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arch Specialty Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4417044.), filed by World Debt Acquisitions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Bobbitt, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: World Debt Acquisitions, LLC v. Arch Specialty Insurance Company (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Erin McDaniel
Represented By: Julie-Karel Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: World Debt Acquisitions, LLC
Represented By: J Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Clinton H. Scott
Represented By: Jonathan L Bobbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?