Hall v. Tacala, LLC
Plaintiff: Kimberley Hall
Defendant: Tacala LLC and Tacala, LLC doing business as Taco Bell
Case Number: 1:2020cv00203
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate by Tacala, LLC (Pippenger, Mark)
September 11, 2020 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge as required by prior court order #3 . (SAC)
August 25, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Travis R McDonough: Scheduling Conference held on 8/25/2020, without court reporter/courtroom deputy. (SAC)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/12/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/27/2021 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on August 25, 2020. (SAC)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pippenger, Mark)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 08/14/2020. (BRS) Notice sent to Attorney Gendreau to finalize registration through ECF.
August 14, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dan J. Gendreau ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4445252.) filed by Tacala, LLC (AML)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dan J. Gendreau ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4445252.) by Tacala, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gendreau Certificate of Good Standing)(Pippenger, Mark)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kimberley Hall of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Chancey, H)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Tacala, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Tacala LLC for Tacala, LLC. (Pippenger, Mark) Modified on 7/31/2020 (BJL).Added Corporate Parent - Tacala Tennessee Corp. to Tacala, LLC Role - dft
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/25/2020, at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 7/24/2020. (CMH)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information, Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/24/2020. (BJL)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss, Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/24/2020. (BJL)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions, Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/24/2020. (BJL)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non Consent) (BJL)
July 24, 2020 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Tacala, LLC. (BJL)
July 22, 2020 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (BJL)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Tacala LLC.(Pippenger, Mark)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bradley County Circuit Court, case number V-20-295. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4420806), filed by Tacala LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified copy of Bradley County Circuit Court File, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Pippenger, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Tacala, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tacala LLC
Represented By: Mark A Pippenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tacala, LLC doing business as Taco Bell
Represented By: Mark A Pippenger
Represented By: Dan J. Gendreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberley Hall
Represented By: H Franklin Chancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?