Sream, Inc. v. Kanku Express #21
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Defendant: Kanku Express #21
Case Number: 1:2020cv00209
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Kanku Express #21. (DJH)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED by Sream, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to be Issued)(Long, Casey)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Casey Adam Long on behalf of Plaintiff Sream, Inc. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 08/06/2020. (KRS)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Orders 3, 4, 5 and docket sheet mailed to Attorney Long. (SAC)
July 30, 2020 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Sream, Inc.. (SAC)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on July 30, 2020. (SAC)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on July 30, 2020. (SAC)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on July 30, 2020. (SAC)
July 30, 2020 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Kanku Express #21. (SAC)
July 30, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Sream, Inc. as to Sream, Inc. (SAC)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Casey Adam Long by Sream, Inc.. (SAC)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kanku Express #21, filed by Sream, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400, pd.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(SAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sream, Inc. v. Kanku Express #21
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kanku Express #21
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Casey Adam Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?