Banker et al v. Fifty Plus Racing Foundation, Inc, et. al.
Plaintiff: Sammye Banker and Jeff Banker
Defendant: Dennis Olthoff, Fifty Plus Racing Foundation, Inc., John Doe and Olthoff Racing, Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv00228
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/10/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 420 - Greeneville before District Judge Clifton L Corker. The expected length of trial is eight (8) days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2022 at 1:30 PM. Dispoitive Motions due by 1/14/2022. See Scheduling Order for details. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/14/2020. (CAT)
October 14, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Clifton L Corker: Scheduling Conference held on 10/14/2020. Order to enter. (AMP)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying as moot #14 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Therefore, pursuant to the Joint Stipulation [Doc. 17] and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41, Plaintiffs' negligence claim against Fifty Plus is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and Fifty Plus's Motion [Doc. 14] is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/05/2020. (AMP)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The parties have filed a Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting [Doc. 18]. Therefore, a telephonic scheduling conference is set for Wednesday, October 14, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. EDT. Counsel for Plaintiffs and counsel for Defendants shall call the chambers conference line at 866-390-1828 and enter access code 4845352 at the designated time. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/05/2020. (AMP)
October 2, 2020 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Powers, Joshua)
October 2, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION by Fifty Plus Racing Foundation, Inc.. (Powers, Joshua)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court after a telephonic scheduling conference unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiffs' counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 09/23/2020. (AMP)
September 23, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Fifty Plus Racing Foundation, Inc.. (Powers, Joshua)
September 23, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Fifty Plus Racing Foundation, Inc.. (Powers, Joshua)
September 23, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Fifty Plus Racing Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Powers, Joshua)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Dennis Olthoff, Olthoff Racing, Inc.(Harris, Christopher)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Fifty Plus Racing Foundation on 09/04/2020, filed by Jeff Banker, Sammye Banker. (Goldberg, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Olthoff Racing, Inc. on 08/25/2020, filed by Jeff Banker, Sammye Banker. (Goldberg, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Dennis Olthoff on 08/25/2020, filed by Jeff Banker, Sammye Banker. (Goldberg, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 08/17/2020. (BRS)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on August 17, 2020. (SAC)Order mailed to Goldberg.
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on August 17, 2020. (SAC)Order mailed to Goldberg.
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on August 17, 2020. (SAC)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on August 17, 2020. (SAC)Order mailed to Goldberg.
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Fifty Plus Racing Foundation, Inc., Olthoff Racing, Inc., Dennis Olthoff. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SAC)Summons mailed to Attorney Goldberg.
August 17, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Sammye Banker, Jeff Banker as to Jeff Banker, Sammye Banker. (SAC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90, receipt #C1017769.) by Jeff Banker, Sammye Banker. (SAC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe(Corporation), John Doe, Fifty Plus Racing Foundation, Inc., Dennis Olthoff, Olthoff Racing, Inc (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt #C1017769.), filed by Jeff Banker, Sammye Banker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(SAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banker et al v. Fifty Plus Racing Foundation, Inc, et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Olthoff
Represented By: Christopher Michael Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifty Plus Racing Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua A Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olthoff Racing, Inc
Represented By: Christopher Michael Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammye Banker
Represented By: Michael L Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Banker
Represented By: Michael L Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?