Floyd v. Aramark Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Curtis Floyd
Defendant: Aramark Correctional Services, LLC and Aramark Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00229
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Those deadlines have passed and the parties have failed to file a Rule 26(f) report. Therefore, a telephonic scheduling conference is set for Thursday, November 12, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. EST. The parties shall file their Rule 26(f) report on or before Monday, November 9, 2020. The parties shall call the Courts conference line at 866-390-1828 and enter access code 4845352 at the appointed time. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/15/2020. (AMP)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court after a telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basisof their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent/Non-Consent). (LCK)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint of Ronald Floyd by Aramark Correctional Services, LLC, Aramark Services, Inc..(Michels, Charles)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 08/17/2020. (AMP)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 08/17/2020. (AMP)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 08/17/2020. (AMP)
August 17, 2020 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (AMP)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Aramark Services, Inc.. (Michels, Charles)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Aramark Correctional Services, Inc.. (Michels, Charles)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bledsoe County Circuit, case number 2020CV5800. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4448661), filed by Aramark Services, Inc., Aramark Correctional Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Michels, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Floyd v. Aramark Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Correctional Services, LLC
Represented By: Louis Gino Marchetti, Jr
Represented By: Charles Michels
Represented By: Keith W Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Services, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Gino Marchetti, Jr
Represented By: Charles Michels
Represented By: Keith W Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Curtis Floyd
Represented By: Timothy O Henshaw
Represented By: James R Kennamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?