Dodd v United States of America
Plaintiff: Robbie Dodd
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00231
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robbie Dodd. United States of America served on 9/9/2020. (Ward, Joshua)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robbie Dodd. United States of America served on 9/1/2020. (Ward, Joshua)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/26/20. (JBR)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/26/20. (JBR)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/26/20. (JBR)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JBR)
August 26, 2020 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (JBR)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4451911.), filed by Robbie Dodd. (Attachments: #1 Other, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Ward, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodd v United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbie Dodd
Represented By: Joshua R Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?