McCullough v. USA
Petitioner: Terrance McCullough
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00232
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The motion to extend (Doc. 3 in Case No. 1:20-cv-232) is hereby GRANTED, and the Government is hereby ORDERED to file a response to the motion on or before October 22, 2020. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/22/2020. (BDG)Order mailed to McCullough
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by USA. (Poole, Christopher)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Terrance McCullough. The Government is hereby ORDERED to file a response to the motion within thirty days from entry of this order. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/20/2020. (BJL)*Copy Mailed to Terrance McCullough
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Terrance McCullough. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AML)
August 19, 2020 Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AML)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCullough v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Christopher D Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terrance McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?