Swann v. Penske et al
Plaintiff: James Swann
Defendant: Penske and J. Taylor
Case Number: 1:2020cv00264
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Expedite trial date and MOTION for US Marshals to Serve Defendants by James Swann. (AML)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE confirming correct mailing address by James Swann (AML)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from James Swann requesting forms (CNC)1983 Civil rights complaint forms sent to Swann (CNC)
September 4, 2020 Error docket entry (BJL) Modified on 9/4/2020 (BJL).
September 4, 2020 Case was originally opened as 1:20-mc-00024. (BJL)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Swann. (BJL)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from James Swann requesting forms and case status. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AML) Requested blank forms were mailed to James Swann
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (BJL)*Mailed to James Swann
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (IFP) - The Court is in receipt of your complaint/petition. However, in order for this matter to proceed, you must either pay the required filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis. (BJL)*Mailed to James Swann, along with a blank forms: IFP Prisoner Form and Certificate of Inmate Account Satement.
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Swann. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swann v. Penske et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Swann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?