Myers v. Cooperative Response Center, Inc. (JRG3)
Plaintiff: Melinda Myers
Defendant: Cooperative Response Center, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00274
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. This entry is the complete Order of the Court. No document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on October 27, 2020. (KLW)
October 27, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Mary Short on behalf of Cooperative Response Center, Inc. (Short, Kathryn)
October 27, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory J Stenmoe on behalf of Cooperative Response Center, Inc. (Stenmoe, Gregory)
October 27, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Maren M. Forde on behalf of Cooperative Response Center, Inc. (Forde, Maren)
October 26, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melinda Myers. (BJL)
October 26, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Melinda Myers *Application for Admission to Practice has been submitted. (BJL) Modified on 10/26/2020 (BJL).
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 10/22/2020. (BRS) Modified on 10/23/2020 (BJL).*Mailed to Attorney Kathryn M. Short
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 10/22/2020. (BRS) Modified on 10/23/2020 (BJL).*Mailed to Attorney Maren M. Forde
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 10/22/2020. (BRS) Modified on 10/23/2020 (BJL).*Mailed to Attorney Gregory Stenmoe
October 22, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gregory Stenmoe, #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Maren M. Forde, #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kathryn M. Short filed by Cooperative Response Center, Inc. as to Cooperative Response Center, Inc. (SAC)
October 21, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Maren M. Forde ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4525748.) by Cooperative Response Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Beemer, Jeffrey)
October 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kathryn M. Short ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4525743.) by Cooperative Response Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Beemer, Jeffrey)
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gregory Stenmoe ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4525717.) by Cooperative Response Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Beemer, Jeffrey)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED:1. As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiffs counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses... Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/20/2020. (JCK)
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Cooperative Response Center, Inc.. (Beemer, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent/Non Consent) (BJL)
October 15, 2020 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 as to Cooperative Response Center, Inc.. (BJL) Modified on 10/15/2020 to correct docket text (BJL).
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cooperative Response Center, Inc..(Beemer, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melinda Myers. Cooperative Response Center, Inc. served on 9/24/2020. (Pinchak, Frank)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (KFB)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/21/20. (KFB)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/21/20. (KFB)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/21/20. (KFB)
September 18, 2020 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (KFB)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cooperative Response Center, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4487436.), filed by Melinda Myers. (Attachments: #1 Other Summons, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Pinchak, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. Cooperative Response Center, Inc. (JRG3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Myers
Represented By: Frank P Pinchak
Represented By: Madison L Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooperative Response Center, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey M Beemer
Represented By: Kathryn Mary Short
Represented By: Maren M. Forde
Represented By: Gregory J Stenmoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?