Ragan v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Robert Ragan
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00068
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court after a telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basisof their claims and defenses. See Order for details. ( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/10/2021). Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 5/27/2021. (LCK)
May 27, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Ragan. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate Good Standing, #2 Other Proposed Order)(Anderson, Claude)
May 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Robert Ragan (Anderson, Claude)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 5/25/21. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent) (GRE)
May 25, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Allen, Craig)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R Allen on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Allen, Craig)
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Registered Agent for Defendant Norfolk Southern,Samantha Sutton c/o CT Corporation System on 04/09/2021, filed by Robert Ragan. (Anderson, Claude)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (LCK)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 3/31/2021. (LCK)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 3/31/2021. (LCK)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 3/31/2021. (LCK)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4699026.), filed by Robert Ragan. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Claude)
March 31, 2021 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (LCK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ragan v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ragan
Represented By: Claude W. Anderson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Craig R Allen
Represented By: Benjamin T. Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?