Zeco, LLC v. Enviro Tech Chemical Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zeco, Inc. and Zeco, LLC doing business as Zee Company
Defendant: Enviro Tech Chemical Services, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Zeco, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00079
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charles E Atchley
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 16 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Enviro Tech Chemical Services, Inc.. (Ogden, Seth)
June 1, 2021 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Enviro Tech Chemical Services, Inc.. (BJL)
May 28, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM for Infringement against Zeco, LLC by Enviro Tech Chemical Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1_2019 Antimicrobial Scope of Work, #2 Exhibit 2_2021 Antimicrobial Scope of Work, #3 Exhibit 3_The Vincit Group Screenshot)(Ogden, Seth)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 5-7-21. (KMG)
May 5, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Zeco, LLC. Enviro Tech Chemical Services, Inc. waiver sent on 4/16/2021. (McDearman, James)
April 22, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Adam Szymanski ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4716250.) filed by Zeco, LLC (BJL)
April 20, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Adam Szymanski ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4716250.) by Zeco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(McDearman, James)
April 20, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffer Ali ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4714517.) filed by Zeco, LLC (BJL)
April 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffer Ali ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4714517.) by Zeco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(McDearman, James)
April 16, 2021 Filing 10 PATENT AND TRADEMARK NOTICE in compliance with 35 USC 290 and/or 15 USC 1116 regarding 10,912,321 . (McDearman, James)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 04/16/2021. (AMP)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 04/16/2021. (AMP)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 04/16/2021. (AMP)
April 16, 2021 Filing 6 Administrative Notice to Counsel: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.1.1, please file the Patent Notice using the event Patent and Trademark Notice under Other Documents. Requirements due by 4/21/2021. (AMP)
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac): Attorneys Jeffer Ali and Adam E Szymanski are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Jeffer Ali and Adam E Szymanski) (AMP)
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet by Zeco, LLC. (McDearman, James)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel: Please file a signed and dated civil cover sheet in a non-fillable format using the event Supplement under Other Documents and link it back to the Complaint. Requirements due by 4/21/2021. (AMP)
April 16, 2021 District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (AMP)
April 16, 2021 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Enviro Tech Chemical Services, Inc. (AMP)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Zeco, Inc.. (McDearman, James)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Enviro Tech Chemical Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4712528.), filed by Zeco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit patent, #2 Exhibit ltr to Wayne Farms, #3 Exhibit ltr 2-9-21, #4 Exhibit ltr 2-23-21, #5 Exhibit ltr 3-3-21)(McDearman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeco, LLC v. Enviro Tech Chemical Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeco, Inc.
Represented By: James S McDearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeco, LLC doing business as Zee Company
Represented By: Adam E Szymanski
Represented By: Jeffer Ali, I
Represented By: James S McDearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enviro Tech Chemical Services, Inc.
Represented By: Seth Rayborn Ogden
Represented By: Ryan D Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Zeco, LLC
Represented By: Adam E Szymanski
Represented By: Jeffer Ali, I
Represented By: James S McDearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?