Blevins v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (JRG2)
Plaintiff: Evelyn Lynn Blevins
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2021cv00142
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Attorney's Office on 8/9/2021, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel on 8/9/2021, and United States Attorney General on 8/10/2021, filed by Evelyn Lynn Blevins. (Palmer, Melissa)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Melissa A. Palmer on behalf of Plaintiff Evelyn Lynn Blevins. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 06/28/2021. (KRS)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (BJL)
June 22, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4767025.) filed by Evelyn Lynn Blevins (BJL)
June 21, 2021 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (BJL)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4767025.) by Evelyn Lynn Blevins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Palmer, Melissa)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4767024.), filed by Evelyn Lynn Blevins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Palmer, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blevins v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (JRG2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Lynn Blevins
Represented By: Melissa A Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?