Covenant Transport, Inc. et al v. Axis Insurance Company (JRG1)
Plaintiff: Southern Refrigerated Transport, LLC and Covenant Transport, Inc.
Defendant: Axis Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00155
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marco A. Pulido on behalf of Plaintiff Covenant Transport, Inc., Southern Refrigerated Transport, LLC. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 07/09/2021. (KRS) Modified on 7/12/2021 (BJL).*Mailed to Attorney Marco A. Pulido
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David P. Bender, Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Covenant Transport, Inc., Southern Refrigerated Transport, LLC. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 07/09/2021. (KRS) Modified on 7/12/2021 (BJL).*Mailed to Attorney David P. Bender, Jr.
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Caroline Hurtado Ford on behalf of Plaintiff Covenant Transport, Inc., Southern Refrigerated Transport, LLC. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 07/09/2021. (KRS) Modified on 7/12/2021 (BJL).*Mailed to Attorney Caroline Hurtado Ford
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael J. Stoner on behalf of Plaintiff Covenant Transport, Inc., Southern Refrigerated Transport, LLC. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 07/09/2021. (KRS) Modified on 7/12/2021 (BJL).*Mailed to Attorney Michael J. Stoner
July 8, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4781976.) filed by Covenant Transport, Inc., Southern Refrigerated Transport, LLC, #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4781968.) filed by Covenant Transport, Inc., Southern Refrigerated Transport, LLC, #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4781986.) filed by Covenant Transport, Inc., Southern Refrigerated Transport, LLC, #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4782357.) filed by Covenant Transport, Inc., Southern Refrigerated Transport, LLC (BJL)
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Marco A. Pulido ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4782357.) by Covenant Transport, Inc., Southern Refrigerated Transport, LLC. (Duggins, Stephen) Modified on 7/8/2021 (BJL).
July 7, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David P. Bender, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4781986.) by Covenant Transport, Inc., Southern Refrigerated Transport, LLC. (Duggins, Stephen) Modified on 7/8/2021 (BJL).
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Caroline Hurtado Ford ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4781976.) by Covenant Transport, Inc., Southern Refrigerated Transport, LLC. (Duggins, Stephen) Modified on 7/8/2021 (BJL).
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J. Stoner ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4781968.) by Covenant Transport, Inc., Southern Refrigerated Transport, LLC. (Duggins, Stephen) Modified on 7/8/2021 (BJL).
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/6/2021. (BDG)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/6/2021. (BDG)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/6/2021. (BDG)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Axis Insurance Company. (BDG)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Covenant Transport, Inc., Southern Refrigerated Transport, LLC. (Duggins, Stephen)
July 6, 2021 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (BDG)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Axis Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4779945.), filed by Covenant Transport, Inc., Southern Refrigerated Transport, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint in underlying action, #2 Exhibit Fourth Amended Complaint in underlying action, #3 Exhibit Axis Insurance Policy, #4 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Summons for Axis)(Duggins, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Covenant Transport, Inc. et al v. Axis Insurance Company (JRG1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Refrigerated Transport, LLC
Represented By: Stephen S Duggins
Represented By: Caroline Hurtado Ford
Represented By: David P. Bender, Jr
Represented By: Marco A. Pulido
Represented By: Michael J. Stoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Covenant Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen S Duggins
Represented By: Caroline Hurtado Ford
Represented By: David P. Bender, Jr
Represented By: Marco A. Pulido
Represented By: Michael J. Stoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axis Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?