Patel v. US Department of Homeland Security, et. al.
Plaintiff: Rakeshkumar Patel
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Alejandro Mayorkas, Acting Director Tracy Renaud and Lynuel W. Dennis
Case Number: 1:2021cv00156
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charles E Atchley
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE.Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on August 24, 2021. (SAC)
August 23, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF CONSENT by Lynuel W. Dennis, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security (Anderson, M)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8-10-21. (KMG)
August 10, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James Hacking by Rakeshkumar Patel. (SAC)
August 10, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Rakeshkumar Patel as to Rakeshkumar Patel. (SAC)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have until September 27, 2021, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 7-20-21. This entry is the Order of the Court. There is no document attached. (KMG) Modified on 7/20/2021, mailed to attorneys Duffey and Hacking. (SAC).
July 16, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Lynuel W. Dennis, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Anderson, M)
July 8, 2021 Filing 13 Administrative Notice to Counsel Duffey requirements and registration for ECF due by 7/22/2021. (SAC)Mailed to Attorney Duffey.
July 8, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Attorney James Hacking, III. (SAC)Order mailed to James Hacking, III.
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on July 8, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Non-Consent Form) (SAC)Order mailed to Attorneys Duffey and Hacking.
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on July 8, 2021. (SAC)Order mailed to Attorneys Duffey and Hacking.
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on July 8, 2021. (SAC)Order mailed to Attorneys Hacking and Duffey.
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on July 8, 2021. (SAC)Order mailed to Attorneys Hacking and Duffey.
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-00906.
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 15, 2021. (lccjn2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/8/2021.]
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case with proposed order by LYNUEL W. DENNIS, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Duffey, Thomas). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on 6/17/2021 (znmw). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/8/2021.]
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 11, 2021. (lccjn2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/8/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 4/13/2021; TRACY RENAUD served on 4/13/2021; UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 4/13/2021; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 4/13/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/14/2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/19/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/18/2021.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hacking, James) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/8/2021.]
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to LYNUEL W. DENNIS, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/8/2021.]
April 5, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/8/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8349280) filed by PATEL RAKESHKUMAR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Hacking, James) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/8/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel v. US Department of Homeland Security, et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rakeshkumar Patel
Represented By: James O. Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Thomas Duffey
Represented By: M Kent Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Thomas Duffey
Represented By: M Kent Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Thomas Duffey
Represented By: M Kent Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Tracy Renaud
Represented By: Thomas Duffey
Represented By: M Kent Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynuel W. Dennis
Represented By: Thomas Duffey
Represented By: M Kent Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?