Children's Health Defense et al v. Food & Drug Administration et al
Plaintiff: Children's Health Defense and Amy Miller
Defendant: Food & Drug Administration and Janet Woodcock
Case Number: 1:2021cv00200
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT re #22 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #14 Amended MOTION to Stay , #25 Reply to Response to Motion, Declaration of Mary Holland by Children's Health Defense, Amy Miller. (Jordan, Derek)
October 20, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #14 Amended MOTION to Stay filed by Children's Health Defense, Amy Miller. (Jordan, Derek)
October 15, 2021 Filing 24 Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Noah T. Katzen re #22 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim: requirements due by 10/20/2021. (AWS)
October 14, 2021 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #14 Amended MOTION to Stay Memorandum in Opposition filed by All Defendants. (Katzen, Noah)
October 14, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Food & Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Katzen, Noah)
October 14, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Ruthsatz Stephens on behalf of All Defendants (Stephens, Kimberly)
September 23, 2021 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #14 Amended MOTION to Stay Amended Declaration of Mark P. Zito filed by Children's Health Defense, Amy Miller. (Jordan, Derek)
September 23, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Food & Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock., filed by Children's Health Defense, Amy Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7)(Jordan, Derek)
September 21, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 Amended MOTION to Stay filed by Children's Health Defense, Amy Miller. (Jordan, Derek)
September 20, 2021 Filing 17 FILED IN ERROR, DUPLICATED FILING-Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Derek Jordan re #14 Amended MOTION to Stay : requirements due by 9/27/2021. (AWS) Modified on 9/20/2021 (AWS).
September 20, 2021 Filing 16 Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Derek Jordan re #14 Amended MOTION to Stay : requirements due by 9/27/2021. (AWS)
September 18, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #14 Amended MOTION to Stay filed by Children's Health Defense, Amy Miller. (Jordan, Derek)
September 17, 2021 Filing 14 Amended MOTION to Stay by Children's Health Defense, Amy Miller. (Jordan, Derek)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 the parties Joint Motion for Entry of SchedulingOrder. After thorough consideration of the motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the Joint Motion [Doc. 12] is ADOPTED and that the parties are to abide by the schedule in their Joint Motion [Doc. 12]. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 9/16/21. (KDO)
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order by Food & Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock. (Katzen, Noah)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah T. Katzen on behalf of All Defendants (Katzen, Noah)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #8 Motion. Plaintiffs have failed to show immediate and irreparable injury... will result to [them] before [the FDA] can be heard in opposition. Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1). Accordingly, Plaintiffs ex parte application [Doc. 8] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 9/10/21. (KDO)
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay re #8 Ex Parte MOTION Ex Parte Application to Issue Stay Order by Children's Health Defense, Amy Miller. (Jordan, Derek)
September 9, 2021 Filing 8 Ex Parte MOTION Ex Parte Application to Issue Stay Order by Children's Health Defense, Amy Miller. (Attachments: #1 Other Declaration of Robert E. Barnes, Esq.)(Jordan, Derek)
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Children's Health Defense, Amy Miller. Food & Drug Administration served on 9/7/2021; Janet Woodcock served on 9/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Jordan, Derek)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Food & Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock (BJL)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Summons Defendant FDA by Children's Health Defense, Amy Miller. (Attachments: #1 Summons Defendant Woodcock)(Jordan, Derek)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 9/1/21. (ABF)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 9/1/21. (ABF)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 9/1/21. (ABF)
September 1, 2021 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (ABF)
September 1, 2021 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Food & Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock.. (ABF)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Food & Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4831455.), filed by Children's Health Defense, Amy Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Other Corp Disclosure Statement)(Jordan, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Children's Health Defense et al v. Food & Drug Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Children's Health Defense
Represented By: Derek A Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Miller
Represented By: Derek A Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food & Drug Administration
Represented By: Noah T. Katzen
Represented By: Kimberly Ruthsatz Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Woodcock
Represented By: Noah T. Katzen
Represented By: Kimberly Ruthsatz Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?