Milk Specialties Company v. GC Lipids, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Milk Specialties Company
Defendant: GC Lipids, LLC, Lutros, LLC and Gold Coast Commodities, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00222
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/9/2021. (AML)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER as soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiffs counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses; for the purpose of discussing the possibility of a prompt settlement or resolution of the case; to make or arrange for the disclosures required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1); to develop a proposed discovery plan that indicates the parties views and proposals concerning all the matters addressed in sub-paragraphs (1) through (4) of Rule 26(f) and, in appropriate cases, to consider whether to consent that all proceedings in this case may beconducted by a United States Magistrate Judge in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/2/21. (KDO)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF RECUSAL. :Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/25/2021. (KRS)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AML)
October 22, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by GC Lipids, LLC.(Williams, James)
October 22, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Lutros, LLC.(Williams, James)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/15/2021. (KRS)
October 14, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Additional Time by Lutros, LLC. (Williams, James)
October 13, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Gold Coast Commodities, Inc..(Maddux, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by Milk Specialties Company Notice of Filing Declaration of Service of GC Lipids, LLC (Nelson, Jonathan)
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT Exhibits 1 through 6 against GC Lipids, LLC, Gold Coast Commodities, Inc., Lutros, LLC., filed by Milk Specialties Company.(Nelson, Jonathan)
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Milk Specialties Company Notice of Filing Declaration of Service on Lutros, LLC (Nelson, Jonathan)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Milk Specialties Company Notice of Filing Declaration of Service on Gold Coast Commodities, Inc. (Nelson, Jonathan)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Milk Specialties Company identifying Corporate Parent MSG Nutritional Ingredients Holding Corp. for Milk Specialties Company. (Nelson, Jonathan)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information, Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 9/17/2021. (BJL)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss, Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 9/17/2021. (BJL)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions, Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 9/17/2021. (BJL)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (Main Document- Lipids LLC- Summons Issued). (Attachments: #1 Lutros LLC-Summons Issued, #2 Gold Coast Commodities, Inc.-Summons Issued)(BJL)
September 17, 2021 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Milk Specialties Company. (BJL)
September 16, 2021 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (BJL)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Exhibits 1 through 6 against Milk Specialties Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4845574.), filed by Milk Specialties Company. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to GC Lipids, LLC, #3 Summons Summons to Lutros, LLC, #4 Summons Summons to Gold Coast Commodities, Inc.)(Nelson, Jonathan)
September 16, 2021 Filing fee paid on 9/16/2021 via pay.gov. Receipt# ATNEDC-4845574 (KMK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milk Specialties Company v. GC Lipids, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milk Specialties Company
Represented By: Jonathan E Nelson
Represented By: Shayne R Clinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GC Lipids, LLC
Represented By: James T Williams, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lutros, LLC
Represented By: James T Williams, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold Coast Commodities, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey William Maddux
Represented By: Nathan Lee Kinard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?