Sequatchie Concrete Service, Inc. et al v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sequatchie Concrete Service, Inc. and Thomas Brothers, LLC
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00223
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charles E Atchley
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel G. Litchfield on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 11/10/2021. (KRS)
November 2, 2021 RECEIPT No. ATNEDC-4887626 (212.00) for Attorney Admission Application for Attorney Daniel G. Litchfield. (BJL) Modified on 11/2/2021 (BJL).
November 2, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company as to The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (BDG)
October 28, 2021 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cothern, Jeremy)
October 28, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). No attorney admission application received, The $90.00 filing fee must be paid.. (BDG)
October 27, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Miller, Cory) Modified on 10/28/2021 (BDG). The certificate of good standing is over 30 days old, but the attorney's good standing has been confirmed.
October 27, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory Richard Miller on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Miller, Cory)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/22/2021 01:00 PM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Charles E Atchley Jr..Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 10/18/2021. (BDG)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mary E. Canty on behalf on The Cincinnati Insurance Company. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/14/2021. (KRS)
October 13, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, by Sequatchie Concrete Service, Inc., Thomas Brothers, LLC.(Cothern, Jeremy)
October 8, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice MARY E. CANTY filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company as to The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (BDG)
October 7, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice MARY E. CANTY by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Chastain, Parks)
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 SECOND NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorneys Canty and Litchfield are not admitted. (BDG)Notice mailed to Litchfield. Serviced via ECF to Canty.
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy - cpp1097832-all, #2 Exhibit B - Property Loss Notice - CL3329150_000027_ZEACFNOL3_20200708155551, #3 Exhibit C - Property Loss Notice, #4 Exhibit D - Letter July 16 2020, #5 Exhibit E - Letter RE Sequatchie Concrete Service - Claim # 337817, #6 Exhibit F - Letter Canty, Mary Beth 06.10.21, #7 Exhibit G - Letter 09.11.2020 Glassock to CIC, #8 Exhibit H - Grecco Emails, #9 Exhibit I - Letter - Feb 11 2021, #10 Exhibit J - Fire Proof of Loss, #11 Exhibit K - Letter - Jan 20 2020, #12 Exhibit L - Letter - Apr 6 2020, #13 Exhibit M - Letter - Jun 29 2020, #14 Exhibit N - Tolling Agreement, #15 Exhibit O - Extended Tolling Agreements, #16 Exhibit P - Letters - Feb 8 2021)(Chastain, Parks)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal J. Harvey Cameron and Attorney John H Cameron terminated. (Cothern, Jeremy)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) (BJL)*Mailed to Attorneys Mary Beth Canty and Daniel Litchfield
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information, Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 9/17/2021. (BJL)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss, Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 9/17/2021. (BJL)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions, Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 9/17/2021. (BJL)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by The Cincinnati Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation for The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (BJL)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Chancery, case number 8209. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4846663), filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Srvd Summ, #3 Exhibit C - OH SOS Records, #4 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Other Corporate Disclosure)(Chastain, Parks)
September 17, 2021 District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sequatchie Concrete Service, Inc. et al v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sequatchie Concrete Service, Inc.
Represented By: Gary R Patrick
Represented By: Jeremy Matthew Cothern
Represented By: John H Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Brothers, LLC
Represented By: Gary R Patrick
Represented By: Jeremy Matthew Cothern
Represented By: John H Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Litchfield
Represented By: Edward Jason Ferrell
Represented By: Mary Canty
Represented By: Parks T Chastain
Represented By: Daniel G Litchfield
Represented By: Cory Richard Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?