UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY, v. Tree-Removal Rights with Respect to Land in Rhea County, Tennessee et al.
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY, and United States of America upon the Relation and for the use of Tennessee Valley Authority
Defendant: Tree-Removal Rights with Respect to Land in Rhea County, Tennessee, and Jose F. Lopez, et ux., Veronica Lopez, Tree-Removal Rights with Respect to Land in Rhea County, Tennessee, Jose F Lopez and Veronia
Case Number: 1:2021cv00235
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 43 U.S.C. ยง 945
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Pursuant to Title 40 United States Code 3114-3118, which authorizes the Court "to give the Government immediate possession of the [condemned] property," it is hereby ORDERED that the Tennessee Valley Authority, as agent of the United States of America, be put into immediate possession of the property rights escribed in the Declaration of Taking filed in this action to the extent necessary to permit the Tennessee Valley Authority to carry on any of its operations described in the pleadings filed herein, and that the Defendants in such action surrender possession of said property rights to the Tennessee Valley Authority accordingly. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/19/2021. (CAT)
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Possession filed by United States of America upon the Relation and for the use of Tennessee Valley Authority. (Chase, James)
October 13, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Possession by United States of America upon the Relation and for the use of Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Possession)(Chase, James)
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by United States of America upon the Relation and for the use of Tennessee Valley Authority of Tendering Deposit (Chase, James)
October 13, 2021 Received $500 Check, receipt # C1018646. (AWS)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Deposit Funds. It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court shall accept a check for $500 to be deposited pursuant to the Declaration of Taking filed in this action, and any future funds to be deposited in this action in accordance with Local Rule 67.1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all funds received shall be deposited in the Court Registry Investment System (CRIS) administered by the Administrative Office of the United States Courts. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/12/2021. (Copy of Order sent to Court Financial Deputy through NEF) (CAT)
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Deposit Funds filed by United States of America upon the Relation and for the use of Tennessee Valley Authority. (Chase, James)
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Deposit Funds by United States of America upon the Relation and for the use of Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Investment Order)(Chase, James)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/1/2021. (BDG)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/1/2021. (BDG)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/1/2021. (BDG)
October 1, 2021 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (BDG)
October 1, 2021 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to All Defendants.. (BDG)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY,. (Attachments: #1 Property Description, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Declaration of Taking, #4 Property Description, #5 Map, #6 Notice of Condemnation, #7 Property Description)(Chase, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY, v. Tree-Removal Rights with Respect to Land in Rhea County, Tennessee et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY,
Represented By: James S Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America upon the Relation and for the use of Tennessee Valley Authority
Represented By: James S Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tree-Removal Rights with Respect to Land in Rhea County, Tennessee, and Jose F. Lopez, et ux.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tree-Removal Rights with Respect to Land in Rhea County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose F Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?