AMB Media, LLC v. OneMB
Plaintiff: AMB Media, LLC
Defendant: OneMB, OneMB, LLC, Red Mountain Media Group, LLC and John Does
Case Number: 1:2022cv00210
Filed: August 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ismail Amin on behalf of Defendants OneMB, LLC, and Red Mountain Media Group, LLC. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 09/21/2022. (KRS) Modified on 9/22/2022 Serviced via email and mail to Ismail Amin. (AWS)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew Vesterdahl on behalf of Defendants OneMB, LLC, Red Mountain Media Group, LLC. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 09/21/2022. (KRS) Modified on 9/22/2022 Serviced via email and mail to Matthew Vesterdahl. (AWS)
September 19, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ismail Amin (Filing fee $ 90, Receipt# 100000143) by OneMB, LLC, Red Mountain Media Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(AWS)
September 19, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew Vesterdahl (Filing fee $ 90, Receipt# 100000143) by OneMB, LLC, Red Mountain Media Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(AWS)
September 19, 2022 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by OneMB, LLC, Red Mountain Media Group, LLC, #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by OneMB, LLC, Red Mountain Media Group, LLC. (AWS)
September 8, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) (BJL)*Mailed to Attorney Matthew Scot Vesterdahl TALG LAW 2211 Michelson Dr, Ste 1170 Irvine, CA 92612-1358
September 8, 2022 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AMB Media, LLC. Red Mountain Media Group, LLC waiver sent on 9/7/2022. (Merritt, Laura)
September 8, 2022 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AMB Media, LLC. OneMB, LLC waiver sent on 9/7/2022. (Merritt, Laura)
August 29, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMB Media, LLC. Red Mountain Media Group, LLC served on 8/24/2022. (Merritt, Laura)
August 29, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMB Media, LLC. OneMB, LLC served on 8/24/2022. (Merritt, Laura)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Regan Sherrell on behalf of Plaintiff AMB Media, LLC. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 08/26/2022. (KRS)
August 25, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Regan Sherrell by AMB Media, LLC. (Merritt, Laura)
August 25, 2022 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Regan Sherrell filed by AMB Media, LLC. (AWS)
August 24, 2022 Filing 13 Certificate of Corporate Interest by AMB Media, LLC. (Merritt, Laura)
August 24, 2022 Filing 12 Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Laura Merritt re #11 Notice (Other) : requirements due by 8/29/2022. (AWS)
August 23, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE by AMB Media, LLC Disclosure Statement (Merritt, Laura)
August 23, 2022 Filing 10 PATENT AND TRADEMARK NOTICE in compliance with 35 USC 290 and/or 15 USC 1116 regarding 90312806 . (Merritt, Laura)
August 23, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Deficiency (PDF) re #8 Patent and Trademark Notice. (AWS)
August 22, 2022 Filing 8 PATENT AND TRADEMARK NOTICE in compliance with 35 USC 290 and/or 15 USC 1116 regarding 90312806 . (Merritt, Laura) (Main Document 8 replaced on 8/23/2022 to print to PDF) (AWS)
August 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Deficiency (PDF) (ABF)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/22/22. (ABF)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/22/22. (ABF)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/22/22. (ABF)
August 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to Regan Sherrell: Attorney is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge ifa pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be foundhere: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vice. (c/m to Regan Sherrell) (ABF)
August 22, 2022 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint: Requirements due by 8/29/2022. Copyright/Patent form not filed (See LR 3.1.1) (ABF)
August 22, 2022 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (ABF)
August 22, 2022 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to John Does, OneMB, Red Mountain Media Group, LLC.. (ABF)
August 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OneMB ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5147316.), filed by AMB Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - LEGACYBOX Trademark Registration Certificate No. 4,785,689, #3 Exhibit 2 - LEGACYBOX Trademark Registration Certificate No. 6,010,996, #4 Exhibit 3 - Screenshots Showing Status of Trademark Registrations, #5 Exhibit 4 - Screenshots Showing Plaintiff's Use of LEGACYBOX mark, #6 Exhibit 5 - Screenshots Showing Defendants' Use of MEMORYBOX mark)(Merritt, Laura) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/22/2022 with flattened pdf) (ABF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMB Media, LLC v. OneMB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMB Media, LLC
Represented By: Laura P Merritt
Represented By: Danielle Johns
Represented By: Regan B Sherrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneMB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneMB, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Scot Vesterdahl
Represented By: Ismail Amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Mountain Media Group, LLC
Represented By: Ismail Amin
Represented By: Matthew Scot Vesterdahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?