McCormick et al v. AmGUARD Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Tim McCormick, Delnita McCormick and Timothy McCormick
Defendant: AmGUARD Insurance Company and Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv00004
Filed: January 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Christopher H Steger
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2024 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wolfe, Joshua)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/17/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2025 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/9/24. (ABF)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 2-6-24. (KMG)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/6/24. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Non-consent) (CNC)
February 5, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by AmGUARD Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Company.(Wolfe, Joshua)
February 5, 2024 Filing 8 Certificate of Corporate Interest by AmGUARD Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent National Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent WestGUARD for AmGUARD Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Company. (Wolfe, Joshua)
February 5, 2024 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ira V. Lee, III filed by Delnita McCormick, Timothy McCormick (CNC)
February 2, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ira V. Lee, III by Delnita McCormick, Timothy McCormick. (Thompson, Robert)
January 24, 2024 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by All Defendants. (Wolfe, Joshua)
January 8, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Notice mailed to Ira Lee. (DCB)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/8/24. (Copy mailed to Ira Lee) (DCB)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/8/24. (Copy mailed to Ira Lee) (DCB)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/8/24. (Copy mailed to Ira Lee) (DCB)
January 8, 2024 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (DCB)
January 8, 2024 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by AmGUARD Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Company. Notice mailed to Ira Lee. (DCB)
January 8, 2024 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Citizenship in a diversity case as required by FRCP 7.1 by AmGUARD Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Company. (Notice mailed to Ira Lee) (DCB)
January 5, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Circuit Court, case number 23C1215. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5560303), filed by Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Company, AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolfe, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCormick et al v. AmGUARD Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delnita McCormick
Represented By: Ira V. Lee, III
Represented By: Robert S Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy McCormick
Represented By: Ira V. Lee, III
Represented By: Robert S Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmGUARD Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua A Wolfe
Represented By: Sanjay Raman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua A Wolfe
Represented By: Sanjay Raman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?