Strobl et al v. Croft et al
Plaintiff: Stacy Strobl and Brian Harding
Defendant: Paul Croft, Jonathan Frost, Rhino Onward International, LLC, ROI Fund I, LLC, ROI Fund II, LLC, ROI Fund III, LLC, ROI Fund IV, LLC, Brian Kawamura, Croft & Frost, PLLC, The Well Fund LLC, Scorpio Ref, LLC, Matthew Dira, The Dira Group, Chestnut Holdings, LLC, Steven Frost, Lisa Frost, Joseph Investments, LLC and Jane and John Does 1-25
Case Number: 1:2024cv00140
Filed: April 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2024 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance W Pope on behalf of All Defendants (Pope, Lance)
May 31, 2024 Gavel Orders Doc. 34 and 35 mailed to Attorneys Dale Mullen, Eric Feiler, Joseph Atkinson, Michael Brady. (CAT)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended for all defendants to June 28, 2024. This entry is the Order of the Court. There is no document attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 5-30-24. (KMG)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 5-30-24. (KMG)
May 23, 2024 Filing 33 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Brian Kawamura. (Eldridge, David)
May 20, 2024 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete Joseph Atkinson, Dale Mullen, Michael Brady, and Eric Feiler regarding document: #29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph E.H. Atkinson ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number BTNEDC-5680723.) filed by Matthew Dira, The Dira Group, #31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael H. Brady ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5680798.) filed by Matthew Dira, The Dira Group, #32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric H. Feiler ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5680815.) filed by Matthew Dira, The Dira Group, #30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dale G. Mullen ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5680777.) filed by Matthew Dira, The Dira Group (CAT)
May 17, 2024 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric H. Feiler ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5680815.) by Matthew Dira, The Dira Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Standing)(Ingram-Hogan, Kimberly)
May 17, 2024 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael H. Brady ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5680798.) by Matthew Dira, The Dira Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Standing)(Ingram-Hogan, Kimberly)
May 17, 2024 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dale G. Mullen ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5680777.) by Matthew Dira, The Dira Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Standing)(Ingram-Hogan, Kimberly)
May 17, 2024 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph E.H. Atkinson ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number BTNEDC-5680723.) by Matthew Dira, The Dira Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Standing)(Ingram-Hogan, Kimberly)
May 14, 2024 Filing 28 STIPULATION under Local Rule 12.1(a) by The Well Fund LLC. (Holloway, J.)
May 3, 2024 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by Lisa Frost, Steven Frost, Joseph Investments, LLC.(Patrick, Gary)
May 1, 2024 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Harding, Stacy Strobl. Rhino Onward International, LLC served on 4/30/2024. (Gastel, Benjamin)
May 1, 2024 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Harding, Stacy Strobl. Scorpio Ref, LLC served on 4/30/2024. (Gastel, Benjamin)
May 1, 2024 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Harding, Stacy Strobl. The Well Fund LLC served on 4/23/2024. (Gastel, Benjamin)
May 1, 2024 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Harding, Stacy Strobl. ROI Fund IV, LLC served on 4/16/2024. (Gastel, Benjamin)
May 1, 2024 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Harding, Stacy Strobl. ROI Fund III, LLC served on 4/16/2024. (Gastel, Benjamin)
May 1, 2024 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Harding, Stacy Strobl. ROI Fund II, LLC served on 4/16/2024. (Gastel, Benjamin)
May 1, 2024 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Harding, Stacy Strobl. ROI Fund I, LLC served on 4/16/2024. (Gastel, Benjamin)
May 1, 2024 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Harding, Stacy Strobl. Steven Frost served on 4/16/2024. (Gastel, Benjamin)
May 1, 2024 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Harding, Stacy Strobl. Lisa Frost served on 4/16/2024. (Gastel, Benjamin)
May 1, 2024 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Harding, Stacy Strobl. Jonathan Frost served on 4/16/2024. (Gastel, Benjamin)
May 1, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Harding, Stacy Strobl. Croft & Frost, PLLC served on 4/16/2024. (Gastel, Benjamin)
May 1, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Harding, Stacy Strobl. Chestnut Holdings, LLC served on 4/16/2024. (Gastel, Benjamin)
May 1, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Harding, Stacy Strobl. Joseph Investments, LLC served on 4/15/2024. (Gastel, Benjamin)
May 1, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Harding, Stacy Strobl. Brian Kawamura served on 4/12/2024. (Gastel, Benjamin)
May 1, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Harding, Stacy Strobl. The Dira Group served on 4/10/2024. (Gastel, Benjamin)
May 1, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Harding, Stacy Strobl. Matthew Dira served on 4/10/2024. (Gastel, Benjamin)
April 25, 2024 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,,,, (for Initial Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) by Matthew Dira, The Dira Group. (Ingram-Hogan, Kimberly)
April 22, 2024 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Stacy Strobl, Brian Harding. (AWS)
April 19, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5654238.) by Brian Harding, Stacy Strobl. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Beridon, Alyson)
April 8, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Attorney Scott A Kramer terminated. (Gastel, Benjamin)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 4/5/24. (c/m to Scott A Kramer, The Kramer Law Firm, PO Box 240461, Memphis, TN 38124) (ABF)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 4/5/24. (c/m to Scott A Kramer, The Kramer Law Firm, PO Box 240461, Memphis, TN 38124) (ABF)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 4/5/24. (c/m to Scott A Kramer, The Kramer Law Firm, PO Box 240461, Memphis, TN 38124) (ABF)
April 5, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Chestnut Holdings, LLC, Paul Croft, Croft & Frost, PLLC, Matthew Dira, Jonathan Frost, Lisa Frost, Steven Frost, Joseph Investments, LLC, Brian Kawamura, ROI Fund I, LLC, ROI Fund II, LLC, ROI Fund III, LLC, ROI Fund IV, LLC, Rhino Onward International, LLC, Scorpio Ref, LLC, The Dira Group, The Well Fund LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jonathan Frost, #2 Summons Rhino Onward International, LLC, #3 Summons ROI Fund I, LLC, #4 Summons ROI Fund II, LLC, #5 Summons ROI Fund III, LLC, #6 Summons ROI Fund IV, LLC, #7 Summons Brian Kawamura, #8 Summons Croft & Frost, PLLC, #9 Summons The Well Fund, LLC, #10 Summons Scorpio Ref, LLC, #11 Summons Matthew Dira, #12 Summons Dira Group, #13 Summons Chesnut Holdings, LLC, #14 Summons Steven Frost, #15 Summons Lisa Frost, #16 Summons Joseph Investments, LLC)(ABF)
April 5, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to Scott Kramer: Attorney is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vice. (c/m to Scott A Kramer, The Kramer Law Firm, PO Box 240461, Memphis, TN 38124) (ABF)
April 5, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to Alyson Beridon: Attorney is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vice. (ABF)
April 5, 2024 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (ABF)
April 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5641721.), filed by Brian Harding, Stacy Strobl. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Scorpio Ref's Articles of Organization, #3 Exhibit B - List of Paul Croft Companies, #4 Exhibit C - Stobl's Membership Interest Purchase Agreements, #5 Exhibit D - Strobl's ROI Fund 1 Account Statement, #6 Exhibit E - Harding's Promissory Note, #7 Exhibit F - Consent Order, #8 Summons for Paul Croft, #9 Summons for Jonathan Frost, #10 Summons for Rhine Onward International, LLC, #11 Summons for ROI Fund I, LLC, #12 Summons for ROI Fund II, LLC, #13 Summons for ROI Fund III, LLC, #14 Summons for ROI Fund IV, LLC, #15 Summons for Brian Kawamura, #16 Summons for Croft & Frost, PLLC, #17 Summons for The Well Fund LLC, #18 Summons for Scorpio Ref, LLC, #19 Summons for Matthew Dira, #20 Summons for The Dira Group, #21 Summons for Chestnut Holdings, LLC, #22 Summons for Steven Frost, #23 Summons for Lisa Frost, #24 Summons for Joseph Investments, LLC)(Gastel, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strobl et al v. Croft et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Strobl
Represented By: Benjamin A Gastel
Represented By: Alyson Beridon
Represented By: Scott A Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Harding
Represented By: Benjamin A Gastel
Represented By: Scott A Kramer
Represented By: Alyson Beridon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Croft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhino Onward International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROI Fund I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROI Fund II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROI Fund III, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROI Fund IV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kawamura
Represented By: David M Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Croft & Frost, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Well Fund LLC
Represented By: J. Michael Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scorpio Ref, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Dira
Represented By: Kimberly Michelle Ingram-Hogan
Represented By: Michael H Brady
Represented By: Dale G Mullen
Represented By: Eric H Feiler
Represented By: Joseph E.H. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dira Group
Represented By: Kimberly Michelle Ingram-Hogan
Represented By: Dale G Mullen
Represented By: Eric H Feiler
Represented By: Michael H Brady
Represented By: Joseph E.H. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chestnut Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Frost
Represented By: Gary R Patrick
Represented By: Cara J Alday
Represented By: Lance W Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Frost
Represented By: Gary R Patrick
Represented By: Cara J Alday
Represented By: Lance W Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Investments, LLC
Represented By: Gary R Patrick
Represented By: Lance W Pope
Represented By: Cara J Alday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?