Cash v. Armstrong et al
Plaintiff: Sage Andrew Cash
Defendant: Autumn Armstrong, Donna Carter, Butch Gallion and Brittany Saunders
Case Number: 2:2014cv00316
Filed: October 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Greeneville Office
County: Hawkins
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Presiding Judge: Dennis H Inman
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM: For the reasons discussed herein, this action will be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(b). The Court CERTIFIES that any appeal from this action would not be taken in good faith and would be totally frivolous. See Fed. R. App. P. 24. Accordingly, should Plaintiff file a notice of appeal, he will be DENIED leave to appeal in forma pauperis. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3); Fed. R. App. P. 24. AN APPROPRIATE JUDGMENT WILL ENTER. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/17/2017. (Copy of Memorandum mailed to Sage Andrew Cash)(JCK)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION: For these reasons, Defendant, Lt. Gallion's motion for summary judgment [Doc. 27] will be GRANTED and he will be DISMISSED from this action. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 03/06/2017. (C/M to pro se Plaintiff) (AMP)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Donna Carter, Autumn Armstrong. For these reasons, Defendants' motion for summary judgment [Doc. 24] will be GRANTED and Autumn Armstrong and Donna Carter will be DISMISSED from this action. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 02/27/2017. (C/M to pro se Plaintiff) (AMP)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED and he is ASSESSED the full filing fee of three hundred and fifty ($350). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this memorandum and order t o the custodian of inmate accounts at the institution where Plaintiff is now confined and to Derrick D. Shofield, Commissioner of the Tennessee Department of Correction. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff service packets for each defendant. See Order for details. (C/M). Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/29/2014. (LMC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cash v. Armstrong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sage Andrew Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autumn Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butch Gallion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?