Jones v. Clemons et al
Plaintiff: |
Raymond Jones |
Defendant: |
Officer Clemons, Preston White and B Beach |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00184 |
Filed: |
July 6, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Greeneville Office |
County: |
Sullivan |
Presiding Judge: |
Clifton L Corker |
Presiding Judge: |
J Ronnie Greer |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 5, 2017 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM: Obviously, Plaintiff has failed to provide the Court with notice of his correct address and, without his correct and current address, neither the Court nor Defendants can communicate with him regarding his case. Accordingly, this action will be DISMISSED, sua sponte, for want of prosecution. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 01/05/2017. (C/M to pro se Plaintiff) (AMP)
|
November 9, 2016 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The application is GRANTED [Id.], and Plaintiff need not pay an upfront filing fee. Nevertheless, the Prison Litigation Reform Act of 1995 (PLRA), makes a prisoner, such as Plaintiff, responsible for paying the filing fee, 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(1), and he therefore is ASSESSED the full filing fee of three hundred, fifty dollars ($350). To ensure compliance with the fee-collection procedure, the Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Memorandum an d Order to the custodian of inmate accounts at the SCDC. The Clerk is also DIRECTED to furnish a copy of this Order to the Court's financial deputy. This action will proceed against Defendants Clemons, White, and Beach on Plaintiff's claims of excessive force. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff three service packets, each of which consists of a blank summons and USM 285 form. Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete the service packets and return them to the Clerk's Office within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/09/2016. (C/M custodian of inmate accounts, pro se Plaintiff with service packets, and email to financial deputy) (AMP)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?