Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America, as subrogee of Janice Bradley and Safeco Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00120
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Greeneville Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Clifton L Corker
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/26/2018. (AML, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Spero, Frankie)
September 18, 2018 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge as required by prior court order. (AMP)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Continue: Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2018 03:00 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Curtis L Collier. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/30/2018. (AML, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Spero, Frankie)
August 23, 2018 Filing 11 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Renegar, Zachary)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 08/21/2018. (AMP)
August 20, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete Zachary V Renegar regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00 Receipt Number G2011050) filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America (CAT)
August 20, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Zachary V Renegar (Filing fee $ 90.00 Receipt Number G2011050) by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (CAT)
August 3, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2018 at 1:30 PM in the Knoxville Video Conference Room before District Judge Curtis L Collier. (CBS)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/1/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/1/18. (ABF)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/1/18. (ABF)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/1/18. (ABF)
July 31, 2018 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (ABF)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Electrolux Home Products, Inc..(Spero, Frankie)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Spero, Frankie)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Greene County, TN, case number CC-18-CV-274 AEP. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3731620), filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Filings, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Spero, Frankie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Frankie Neil Spero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America, as subrogee of Janice Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Jeremy L Jones
Represented By: Zachary V Renegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?