McCarter v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC et al (JRG2)

Plaintiff: Michael McCarter and Michael B McCarter
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC and Wilson and Associates, PLLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00131
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Greeneville Office
County: Hamblen
0 Judge: Clifton L Corker
1 Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Wilson & Associates as a Party by Wilson and Associates, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Agreed Order of Dismissal)(Morgan, Gerald)
October 1, 2018 Filing 12 Administrative Notice to Counsel #11 Stipulation of Dismissal : A joint motion must be filed in order to submit an agreed order. Requirements due by 10/9/2018. (CAT)
September 28, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal Party Wilson & Associates by Wilson and Associates, PLLC. (Morgan, Gerald)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 09/26/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Elizabeth Campbell) (AMP)
September 26, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth J. Campbell ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3777219.) filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (AMP)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth J. Campbell ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3777219.) by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Roberts, Lauren)
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney Elizabeth J. Campbell is not admitted. This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Elizabeth J. Campbell) (CAT)
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2017 Notices of Default and Intent to Accelerate, #2 Exhibit B - January 25, 2018 Notice Letters, #3 Exhibit C - April 4, 2018 Letter from PennyMac, #4 Exhibit D - April 18, 2018 Letters to Plaintiff)(Roberts, Lauren)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant, PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, has moved for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint [Doc. 5]. Defendant advises that the motion is unopposed. The motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall have to and including September 10, 2018, in which to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 08/21/2018. (CAT)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Roberts, Lauren)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/14/18. (JBR)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/14/18. (JBR)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/14/18. (JBR)
August 14, 2018 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (JBR)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Chancery Court for Hamblen County, TN, case number 2018-cv-314. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3742802), filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Other Consent to Removal by Wilson and Associates, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Roberts, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarter v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC et al (JRG2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McCarter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael B McCarter
Represented By: Eric Byron Foust
Represented By: William Evan Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Lauren P Roberts
Represented By: Elizabeth J Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson and Associates, PLLC
Represented By: Gerald Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?