Sterner v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Stephen George Sterner, Sr
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, TransUnion and Experian
Case Number: 2:2018cv00159
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian, and TransUnion and returned to pro se Plaintiff for service. (AMP)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/19/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Stephen Sterner) (AMP)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/19/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Stephen Sterner) (AMP)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/19/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Stephen Sterner) (AMP)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the complaint without prepayment of costs or fees. The Court is unable to state that the cause of action is clearly frivolous; accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to issue process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/19/2018. (Copy of Order and blank Summons mailed to Stephen Sterner) (AMP)
October 10, 2018 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (RET, )
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, the Court finds this case and Case No. 2:86-CV-0158 should be deemed related. Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Travis R. McDonough and the undersigned, Magistrate Judge Clifton L. Corker, this case should also be assigned likewise.Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/10/2018. (RET, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (Copy of Notice mailed to Stephen Sterner) (AMP)
September 20, 2018 Case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Corker for related case determination. (AMP)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian, TransUnion (Filing fee NOT PAID), filed by Stephen George Sterner, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Equifax, #2 Letter to Experian, #3 Letter to Transunion, #4 Fair Credit Billing Act, #5 Envelope) (AMP)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephen George Sterner, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AMP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sterner v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen George Sterner, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?