Harvey et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al (JRG1)

Plaintiff: Freda May Harvey and James Wheeler
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Case Number: 2:2018cv00173
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: Tennessee Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Clifton L Corker
1 Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 15 MOTION to Amend/Revise Complaint by Freda May Harvey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Other Proposed)(Starnes, Robert)
December 5, 2018 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (Morris, Samuel)
November 28, 2018 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Freda May Harvey. (Starnes, Robert)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER : Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiffs counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/26/2018. (JCK, )
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 11 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Nonconsent) (JCK)
November 21, 2018 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trustee's Deed, #2 Exhibit B - Detainer Judgment)(Morris, Samuel)
November 21, 2018 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (Morris, Samuel)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Before the Court is Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint [Doc. 7]. The parties previously stipulated to a twenty-one (21) day extension to November 7, 2018, for Defendants to respond to the Complaint. Defendants now seek an additional fourteen (14) day extension of time to November 21, 2018 to respond. The motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall have to and including Wednesday, November 21, 2018, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/07/2018. (CAT)
November 6, 2018 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (Manley, Reid)
October 16, 2018 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Joint) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (Manley, Reid)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/11/18. (KFB, )
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/11/18. (KFB, )
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/11/18. (KFB, )
October 10, 2018 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (KFB, )
October 10, 2018 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Manley, Reid)
October 10, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court Sullivan County, case number C42346. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3790259), filed by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Manley, Reid)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvey et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al (JRG1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Reid Stephens Manley
Represented By: Samuel Aitken Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Reid Stephens Manley
Represented By: Samuel Aitken Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freda May Harvey
Represented By: Robert P Starnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wheeler
Represented By: Robert P Starnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?