Casey-Dye et al v. BPS Direct, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Randy Jason Dye and Ashley Nicole Casey-Dye
Defendant: TMBC, L.L.C., Textron, Inc., Bass Pro Outdoor World, L.L.C., Textron Specialized Vehicles, Inc. and BPS Direct, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00188
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Textron Specialized Vehicles, Inc., Textron, Inc. (Spainhour, Charles)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/11/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2020 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/6/2018. (DJH, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 27 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Spainhour, Charles)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/19/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Charles A. Stewart, III) (AMP)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/19/2018. (Copy of Order mailed M. Bryan Slaughter) (AMP)
November 19, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles A. Stewart III filed by Textron Specialized Vehicles, Inc., Textron, Inc. . (AMP)
November 16, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for M. Bryan Slaughter regarding document: #23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by M. Bryan Slaughter (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G2011247) filed by Ashley Nicole Casey-Dye, Randy Jason Dye (CAT)
November 16, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles A. Stewart III by Textron Specialized Vehicles, Inc., Textron, Inc.. (Spainhour, Charles)
November 15, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by M. Bryan Slaughter (Filing fee $ 90.00 Receipt Number G2011247) by Ashley Nicole Casey-Dye, Randy Jason Dye(as next friend and parent of D.J.D.), Randy Jason Dye(as next friend and parent of K.G.D. ). (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Baker, Jennifer) Modified docket text to reflect payment received and receipt number on 11/16/2018 (CAT).
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on November 14, 2018. (KLWa, )
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent / Non Consent) (CAT)
November 13, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint by Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC by Bass Pro Outdoor World, L.L.C..(Anderson, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by BPS Direct, LLC by BPS Direct, LLC.(Anderson, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by TMBC, L.L.C. by TMBC, L.L.C..(Anderson, John)
November 7, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney Charles A Stewart III is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (Copy of Notice mailed to Charles A. Stewart, III) (AMP)
November 6, 2018 Filing 16 Certificate of Corporate Interest by TMBC, L.L.C. (Anderson, John) Modified docket text on 11/7/2018 to reflect correct party (AMP).
November 6, 2018 Filing 15 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Bass Pro Outdoor World, L.L.C. (Anderson, John) Modified docket text on 11/7/2018 to reflect correct party (AMP).
November 6, 2018 Filing 14 Certificate of Corporate Interest by BPS Direct, LLC. (Anderson, John) Modified docket text on 11/7/2018 to reflect correct party (AMP).
November 6, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CONSENT to Removal by BPS Direct, LLC, Bass Pro Outdoor World, L.L.C., TMBC, L.L.C. (Anderson, John)
November 6, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John E Anderson on behalf of BPS Direct, LLC, Bass Pro Outdoor World, L.L.C., TMBC, L.L.C. (Anderson, John)
November 6, 2018 Filing 11 Textron Specialized Vehicle Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Textron Specialized Vehicles, Inc., Textron, Inc.. (Spainhour, Charles)
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 Textron Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Textron Specialized Vehicles, Inc., Textron, Inc.. (Spainhour, Charles)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/6/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Jennifer Baker and M. Bryan Slaughter) (CAT)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/6/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Jennifer Baker and M. Bryan Slaughter) (CAT)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/6/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Jennifer Baker, and M. Bryan Slaughter) (CAT)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney M. Bryan Slaughter is not admitted. This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to M. Bryan Slaughter) (CAT)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Textron Specialized Vehicles, Inc., Textron, Inc.. (Spainhour, Charles)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Textron Specialized Vehicles, Inc., Textron, Inc.. (Spainhour, Charles)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Notice of Removal : Please refile Corporate Disclosure Statements using the event Certificate of Corporate Interest found under the category Other Documents. Requirements due by 11/13/2018. (CAT)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel: Attorney Jennifer A Baker is not registered for CM/ECF. Requirements due by 11/13/2018. (Copy of Notice of Deficiency mailed to Jennifer Baker) (CAT)
November 6, 2018 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (CAT)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sullivan County Circuit Court, case number C15711. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3811266), filed by Textron, Inc., Textron Specialized Vehicles, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sullivan County Circuit Pleadings, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Other Textron, Inc. Corporate Disclosure, #4 Other Textron Specialized Vehicles Corporate Disclosure)(Spainhour, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casey-Dye et al v. BPS Direct, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Jason Dye
Represented By: M Bryan Slaughter
Represented By: Jennifer A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Nicole Casey-Dye
Represented By: M Bryan Slaughter
Represented By: Jennifer A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMBC, L.L.C.
Represented By: John E Anderson
Represented By: Ariel Mason Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Frederick Spainhour
Represented By: Charles A Stewart, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bass Pro Outdoor World, L.L.C.
Represented By: John E Anderson
Represented By: Ariel Mason Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron Specialized Vehicles, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Frederick Spainhour
Represented By: Charles A Stewart, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BPS Direct, LLC
Represented By: John E Anderson
Represented By: Ariel Mason Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?