Robinson v. CBA of GA, Inc.

Plaintiff: Harriet E Robinson
Defendant: CBA of GA, Inc. and Merchants and Medical Adjustment Bureau, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00191
Filed: November 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Clerk's Default as to Merchants and Medical Adjustment Bureau, Inc. by Harriet E Robinson. Party is instructed to email the proposed default to the clerk at the appropriate email address in accordance with #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil_forms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lee Declaration)(Lee, Alan)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harriet E Robinson. Merchants and Medical Adjustment Bureau, Inc. served on 12/4/2018. (Lee, Alan)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Merchants and Medical Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (CAT)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's First against Merchants and Medical Adjustment Bureau, Inc.., filed by Harriet E Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Equifax CR Info, #2 Exhibit 2 - TransUnion CR Info, #3 Exhibit 3 - Merchants - GA Corp Info, #4 Summons - Merchants)(Lee, Alan)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/13/18. (JBR)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/13/18. (JBR)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/13/18. (JBR)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CBA of GA, Inc. (JBR)
November 13, 2018 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (JBR)
November 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3815234.), filed by Harriet E Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Equifax CR Info, #2 Exhibit 2 - CBA - TN Corp Info, #3 Exhibit 3 - TN Coll Service Info, #4 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons - CBA)(Lee, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. CBA of GA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBA of GA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchants and Medical Adjustment Bureau, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harriet E Robinson
Represented By: Alan C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?