Morgan v. Medtronic, Inc. et al (TV3)

Plaintiff: Aunda Morgan
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic MiniMed, Inc. and Medtronic USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00219
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate Judge by Medtronic MiniMed, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. (Pratt, P)
February 12, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge as required by prior court order. (AMP)
January 15, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Stay Case by Medtronic MiniMed, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Pratt, P)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 12/26/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Robert F. Tom) (CAT)
December 26, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert F. Tom (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic MiniMed, Inc. as to Medtronic MiniMed, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. (AMP)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 12/26/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Joseph Ceronsky and Judah A Druck) (AMP)
December 26, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Nicole E. Narotzky] ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3845817.) filed by Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic MiniMed, Inc., #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Joseph P. Ceronsky] ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3845763.) filed by Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic MiniMed, Inc., #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Judah A. Druck] ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3845787.) filed by Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic MiniMed, Inc. as to Medtronic MiniMed, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. (AMP)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (Copy of Order mailed to Joseph Ceronsky and Judah Druck) (AMP)
December 21, 2018 Check for MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert F. Tom filing fee being mailed on 12/21/18. (JAN, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert F. Tom (Filing fee $ 90.00 Receipt Number G2011297) by Medtronic MiniMed, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Tom, Robert) Modified docket text to reflect payment received and receipt number on 12/26/2018 (CAT).
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Nicole E. Narotzky] ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3845817.) by Medtronic MiniMed, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Pratt, P)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Judah A. Druck] ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3845787.) by Medtronic MiniMed, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Pratt, P)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Joseph P. Ceronsky] ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3845763.) by Medtronic MiniMed, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Pratt, P)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Medtronic MiniMed, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc..(Pratt, P)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/17/2018. (JCK)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/17/2018. (JCK)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/17/2018. (JCK)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Attorneys Nicole Narotzky, Joseph Ceronsky, Judah Druck, and Robert Tom are not admitted. This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Nicole Narotzky, Joseph Ceronsky, Judah Druck, and Robert Tom) (JCK)
December 17, 2018 Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (JCK)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Medtronic MiniMed, Inc.. (Pratt, P)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Medtronic USA, Inc.. (Pratt, P)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Medtronic, Inc.. (Pratt, P)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamblen County Circuit Court, case number 18CV152. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3840896), filed by Medtronic MiniMed, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Medtronic, Inc. - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Medtronic USA, Inc. - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit C - Medtronic MiniMed, Inc. - State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal - State Court, #5 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Pratt, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Medtronic, Inc. et al (TV3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aunda Morgan
Represented By: Steven W Terry
Represented By: Christopher P Capps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P Ceronsky
Represented By: Judah A Druck
Represented By: Nicole E Narotzky
Represented By: Robert F Tom
Represented By: P Edward Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic MiniMed, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P Ceronsky
Represented By: Judah A Druck
Represented By: Nicole E Narotzky
Represented By: P Edward Pratt
Represented By: Robert F Tom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic USA, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P Ceronsky
Represented By: Judah A Druck
Represented By: Nicole E Narotzky
Represented By: Robert F Tom
Represented By: P Edward Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?