Charlton v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (PLR1)

Plaintiff: Ashley Charlton and Logan Charlton
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, East, LP and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,
Case Number: 2:2018cv00221
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,. (Attachments: #1 Other attachment)(Callaway, Gregory)
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,.(Callaway, Gregory)
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gregory W Callaway (Callaway, Gregory)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory W Callaway on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, (Callaway, Gregory)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,. (JCK)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Summons Wal-Mart Stores, East, LP by Ashley Charlton. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Meade, Evan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Summons by Ashley Charlton. (Meade, Evan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Ashley Charlton. (Meade, Evan)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/20/18. (JBR)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/20/18. (JBR)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/20/18. (JBR)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Evan Meade: Cover Sheet not included. Please file a Civil Cover Sheet using the "Supplement" event. Requirements due by 12/26/2018. (JBR)
December 20, 2018 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (JBR)
December 20, 2018 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (JBR)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores, East, LP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3843471.), filed by Logan Charlton, Ashley Charlton.(Meade, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charlton v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Charlton
Represented By: Evan M.E. Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan Charlton
Represented By: Evan M.E. Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,
Represented By: Gregory W Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?