Wilder v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (PLR2)
Plaintiff: Eddie A. Wilder
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2019cv00006
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Hard copy of transcript received via mail and placed in designated filing cabinet. (JCK)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 (Case at Issue) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge (Copy of Notice mailed to Eddie A. Wilder)(JCK)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Setting SSA Briefing Schedule Social Security Briefing Schedule DDL set for 6/5/2019.Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 3/7/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Eddie A. Wilder)(JCK)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT Complete Administrative Record by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. (McClanahan, Leah)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of Complete Administrative Record (McClanahan, Leah)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of.(McClanahan, Leah)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 1/15/2019 c/o US Attorney General. (CAT)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 1/14/2019. (CAT)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 1/14/2019 c/o US Attorney. (CAT)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons United States Attorney General, #2 Summons United States Attorney)(Given with copy of order granting IFP, and USM 285 form to USMS for service of process(JCK)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 1/8/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Eddie Wilder)(JCK)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 SSA COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Filing fee $ NOT PAID), filed by Eddie A. Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Office of Regional Chief Counsel, #4 Summons United States Attorney General, #5 Summons U.S. Attorney) (CAT)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie A. Wilder. (CAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilder v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Represented By: Leah Walker McClanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie A. Wilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?