Swinney et al v. Fullagar (PLR1)

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Meredith and Mary Christine Swinney
Defendant: M.D. Timothy Fullagar
Case Number: 2:2019cv00014
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Clifton L Corker
1 Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by Elizabeth Meredith, Mary Christine Swinney(Aministratrix of the Estate of Nancy Ann Paxton, Deceased), Mary Christine Swinney. (McAfee, Timothy)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 Second Administrative Notice to Counsel re #1 Complaint : Please file a completed civil cover sheet using the event "Supplement" found under the category "Other Documents" and then link it back to the complaint. Requirements due by 2/13/2019. (JCK)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 1/30/2019. (BDG, )
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 1/30/2019. (BDG, )
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 1/30/2019. (BDG, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : Civil cover sheet not included. requirements due by 2/4/2019. (BDG, )
January 30, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Timothy Fullagar.. (BDG, )
January 30, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (BDG, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy Fullagar ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3876670.), filed by Mary Christine Swinney, Elizabeth Meredith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(McAfee, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swinney et al v. Fullagar (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Timothy Fullagar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Meredith
Represented By: Timothy W McAfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Christine Swinney
Represented By: Timothy W McAfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?