Anderson v. Jarnigan
Plaintiff: Stephen D Anderson
Defendant: Esco Jarnigan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00020
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Custodian of Inmate Accounts stating inmate is not in TDOC custody. (ABF)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Stephen D. Anderson. MOTION #1 for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Stephen D Anderson is GRANTED. Because Plaintiff is an inmate in the Bledsoe County Correctional Complex, he is ASSESSED the civil filing fee of $350.00. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this order to the custodian of inmate accounts at the institution where Plaintiff is now confined. The Clerk is also DIRECTED to furnish a copy of this order to the Courts financial deputy.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/15/19. (c/m to Stephen D Anderson #109944, BLEDSOE COUNTY CORRECTIONAL COMPLEX, 1045 HORSEHEAD ROADPIKEVILLE, TN 37367 and to the Custodian of Inmate Accounts at Bledsoe County Correctional)(ABF)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (Copy of Notice mailed to Stephen D. Anderson) (JCK)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal Case by Stephen D Anderson. (JCK)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Esco Jarnigan (Filing fee NOT PAID), filed by Stephen D Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(JCK)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephen D Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Trust Account, #2 Envelope)(JCK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Jarnigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esco Jarnigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen D Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?