Gerber Technology, Inc v. Joseph

Plaintiff: Gerber Technology, Inc and Gerber Technology LLC
Defendant: Jack Joseph
Case Number: 2:2019cv00024
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Clifton L Corker
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED ANSWER to Answer by Jack Joseph. (Slaughter, Frank)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 04/05/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent / Non Consent) (CAT)
April 4, 2019 Filing 19 Jack Joseph ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Complaint from Gerber by Jack Joseph.(Slaughter, Frank)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Defendant filed an Agreed Order [Doc. 15] but styled the Agreed Order a Stipulation for extension of time. The stipulation is the parties' agreement to an extension of time for Defendant to respond to the complaint. No order is necessary for this initial extension. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by April 7, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 4/3/2019. (JCK)
April 2, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Other Agreed Order)(Slaughter, Frank)
March 29, 2019 Filing 16 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #15 Stipulation : Per ECF rule 4.8 a joint motion must be filed in order to submit an agreed order. The agreed order must be filed as an attachment to the motion. Requirements due by 4/3/2019. (JCK)
March 28, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION for extension of time by All Defendants. (Slaughter, Frank)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Plaintiff has filed Motions for admission of Jonathan B. Tropp, Esq. and Woo Sin Sean Park, Esq., pro hac vice in this action [Docs. 12 & 13]. The Motions are GRANTED. Counsel MUST register immediately as CM/ECF users in this district. The registration form can be found at the Court's website, www.tned.uscourts.gov under "For Attorneys" and "Electronic Case Filing."Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 03/15/2019. ( Copy of Order mailed to Jonathan Tropp and Woo Sin "Sean" Park) (CAT)
March 14, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for attorneys Jonathan B. Tropp and Woo Sin Park regarding document: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Woo Sin "Sean" Park ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3917484.), #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan B. Tropp ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3917476.) filed by Gerber Technology LLC (JCK)
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Woo Sin "Sean" Park ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3917484.) by Gerber Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Woo Sin "Sean" Park, #2 Other Proposed Order)(Mills, Paige)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan B. Tropp ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3917476.) by Gerber Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jonathan Tropp, #2 Other Proposed Order)(Mills, Paige)
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gerber Technology LLC. Jack Joseph served on 3/4/2019. (Mills, Paige)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 PATENT AND TRADEMARK NOTICE in compliance with 35 USC 290 and/or 15 USC 1116 regarding TX 8-66s-s4s . (Mills, Paige)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Gerber Technology LLC of Filing of Action Regarding An Interest in Copyright (Mills, Paige)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 2/26/2019. (BJL,)*Mailed to Attorneys Jonathan Tropp and Woo Sin "Sean" Park.
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 2/26/2019. (BJL,)*Mailed to Attorneys Jonathan Tropp and Woo Sin "Sean" Park.
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 2/26/2019. (BJL, ) Modified on 2/26/2019 (BJL,).*Mailed to Attorneys Jonathan Tropp and Woo Sin "Sean" Park.
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jack Joseph. (BJL, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) for Attorneys Jonathan Tropp and Woo Sin "Sean" Park (BJL, ) Modified on 2/26/2019 (BJL, ).*Mailed to Jonathan Tropp and Woo Sin "Sean" Park
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel requirements due by 3/4/2019. Please file the Copydright/Patent form as set forth in LR 3.1.1.(BJL, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Gerber Technology, Inc. (Mills, Paige) Modified on 2/26/2019 (BJL, ). Added Corporate Parent - Gerber Scientific LLC to Gerber Technology LLC Role - pla
February 25, 2019 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (BJL, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jack Joseph ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3901186.), filed by Gerber Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Software License Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - CW Copyright Registration, #3 Exhibit 3 - CR Website, #4 Exhibit 4 - Invoice, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Mills, Paige)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerber Technology, Inc v. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Joseph
Represented By: Frank L Slaughter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerber Technology, Inc
Represented By: Paige W Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerber Technology LLC
Represented By: Paige W Mills
Represented By: Jonathan Tropp
Represented By: Woo Sin "Sean&quot Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?