Wilkerson v. Wheeler Trucking, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Craig Wilkerson and Renee Wilkerson
Defendant: Wheeler Trucking, Inc. and David J. Wendel
Case Number: 2:2019cv00030
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The parties have notified the Court of a scheduling conflict with the telephonic conference previously set for May 2, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. EDT. The telephone conference is rescheduled to Monday, May 20, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. EDT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 05/01/2019. (AMP)
April 25, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Jeffrey Craig Wilkerson, Renee Wilkerson Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Terry, F)
April 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by David J. Wendel, Wheeler Trucking, Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Fraser, Brad)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: A telephonic conference will be conducted on Thursday, May 2, at 2:30 p.m. EDT to discuss the Scheduling Order previously entered by the District Judge and determine whether any dates should be adjusted. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 04/23/2019. (AMP)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 4/18/19. (aws, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF CONSENT by David J. Wendel, Wheeler Trucking, Inc. (Fraser, Brad)
April 17, 2019 Filing 15 FILLED IN ERROR, SEE #14 -Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Brad A. Fraser re #13 Notice of Consent/Nonconsent : requirements due by 4/22/2019. (aws, ) Modified on 4/17/2019 (aws, ).
April 17, 2019 Filing 14 Administrative Notice to Counsel #13 Notice of Consent/Nonconsent : Please file the Notice of Consent in a non-fillable form and enter the parties' names in the section that states Parties' Printed Names. Requirements due by 4/22/2019. (AMP)
April 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CONSENT by David J. Wendel, Wheeler Trucking, Inc. (Fraser, Brad)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by David J. Wendel, Wheeler Trucking, Inc.. (Fraser, Brad)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/19/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2020 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 4/9/2019. (AML, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fraser, Brad)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Counsel for the parties are hereby ORDERED to show cause no later than April 15, 2019 , as to why they should not be sanctioned for their failure to comply with the Courts Order. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 4/8/19. (aws, )
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 03/15/2019. (KLWa, )
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 03/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AMP)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by David J. Wendel, Wheeler Trucking, Inc..(Fraser, Brad)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wheeler Trucking, Inc.. (Fraser, Brad)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 3/7/19. (ABF)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss, Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 3/7/19. (ABF)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 3/7/19. (ABF)
March 7, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Wheeler Trucking, Inc.. (ABF)
March 6, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (ABF)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greene County Circuit Court, case number CC19CV41BB. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3910735), filed by Wheeler Trucking, Inc., David J. Wendel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Fraser, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkerson v. Wheeler Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheeler Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Brad A Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Wendel
Represented By: Brad A Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Craig Wilkerson
Represented By: F Braxton Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Wilkerson
Represented By: F Braxton Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?