Eskridge v. Circuit Court of Sullivan County Tennessee

Petitioner: David Adam Eskridge
Respondent: Circuit Court of Sullivan County Tennessee
Case Number: 2:2019cv00069
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Copy of Docket Sheet with new case number mailed to David Adam Eskridge. (CAT)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (Copy of Notice mailed to David Adam Eskridge) (CAT)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00232.
April 26, 2019 Case transferred to the Eastern District of Tennessee. Case sent electronically to EDTN per Order entered 4/26/19. (jsau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/29/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Transferring Action to Eastern District of Tennessee) It is hereby ORDERED that this action is FILED solely for the administrative convenience of the Clerk; the action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee. The Clerk of this Court is directed to transfer all pleadings filed in this case to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 4/26/19. Copy mailed to petitioner. (jsau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/29/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Letter RECEIVED by David Eldridge re: Copies. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (sbea, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/29/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 Letter by David Adam Eskridge re: Copy of Petition. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Clerk, #2 Envelope). (sbea, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/29/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 Memorandum filed by David Adam Eskridge re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H). (sbea, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/29/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by David Adam Eskridge; (Filing Fee: $5.00 Receipt Number: 34683043385). (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Receipt). (sbea, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eskridge v. Circuit Court of Sullivan County Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Circuit Court of Sullivan County Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Adam Eskridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?