Leach v. USA

Petitioner: Jeff Leach
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00077
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: R Leon Jordan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (RET)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 nunc pro tunc Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Respondent shall have an additional thirty days within which to file its response. This entry constitutes the complete order of the Court. There is no document to this entry. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 07/01/2019. (RHC) Modified on 7/2/2019 to reflect copy of Order mailed to Jeff Leach (AMP).
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), #4 Order, by USA. (Lampe, J)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The United States Attorney is ORDERED to file an answer or other pleading to the motion within thirty (30) days from entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 5/13/19. (copy mailed to Jeff Leach at Loretto) (JBR)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (Copy of Notice mailed to Jeff Leach)(JCK)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCK)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Jeff Leach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 First Superseding Indictment, #4 Envelope)(JCK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leach v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: J Christian Lampe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeff Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?