Johns v. Jarnagin et al (JRG1)

Plaintiff: Joseph Johns
Defendant: Morristown City Police Officer #1, Bill Brittain, Hamblen County Police Officer #2, Hamblen County Police Officer #4, Hamblen County Police Officer #3, Ingram, Hamblen County Police Officer #1, Hamblen County Police Officer #5, Morristown City Police Officer #2 and Esco Jarnagin
Case Number: 2:2019cv00078
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 06/06/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Joseph Johns) (AMP)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 06/06/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Joseph Johns) (AMP)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 06/06/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Joseph Johns) (AMP)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (Copy of Notice mailed to Joseph Johns) (AMP)
June 6, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to All Defendants. (AMP)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying as moot #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. However, on May 17, 2019, Plaintiff paid the filing fee of $400. Therefore, the Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 1] is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 06/06/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Joseph Johns) (AMP)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bill Brittain, Hamblen County Police Officer #1, Hamblen County Police Officer #2, Hamblen County Police Officer #3, Hamblen County Police Officer #4, Hamblen County Police Officer #5, Ingram, Esco Jarnagin, Morristown City Police Officer #1, Morristown City Police Officer #2., filed by Joseph Johns. (Attachments: #1 B1, #2 B2, #3 B3, #4 B4, #5 B5, B6 are audio and video discs, #6 B7, #7 B8, #8 B9, #9 B10, #10 B11, #11 B12, #12 B13, #13 B14). (LMC)
May 17, 2019 Filing fee PAID - $ 400.00, receipt number G2011599 (LMC)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT (Amended Page 3 to Motion to reflect source of income) to #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Johns. (AMP)
May 14, 2019 Audio and Video Discs (B6) re #1 Complaint received and placed in Miscellaneous Drawer in designated filing cabinet. (AMP)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee NOT PAID), filed by Joseph Johns. (Attachments: #1 B1, #2 B2, #3 B3, #4 B4, #5 B5, (B6 is audio and video discs) #6 B7, #7 B8, #8 B9, #9 B10, #10 B11, #11 B12, #12 B13, #13 B14) (AMP)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Johns. (AMP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johns v. Jarnagin et al (JRG1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morristown City Police Officer #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Brittain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamblen County Police Officer #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamblen County Police Officer #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamblen County Police Officer #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamblen County Police Officer #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamblen County Police Officer #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morristown City Police Officer #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esco Jarnagin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?