Forsythe v. First Financial Investment Fund Holdings, LLC et al (TV2)

Plaintiff: Donna L Forsythe and Donna L. Forsythe
Defendant: First Financial Investment Fund Holdings, LLC, Buffaloe & Vallejo, PLC and First Financial Investment Fund VI, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00079
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 07/08/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AMP)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Buffaloe & Vallejo, PLC. (Walter, Glenn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Corporate Interest by First Financial Investment Fund Holdings, LLC, First Financial Investment Fund VI, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Strategic Alliance, Inc. d/b/a FFAM360 Alliance for First Financial Investment Fund Holdings, LLC, First Financial Investment Fund VI, LLC. (Walter, Glenn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Buffaloe & Vallejo, PLC, First Financial Investment Fund Holdings, LLC, First Financial Investment Fund VI, LLC.(Walter, Glenn)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Pursuant to Local Rule 12.1 by All Defendants. (Walter, Glenn)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna L. Forsythe. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Other ROS - FFIF Holdings, #2 Other ROS - FFIF VI)(Lee, Alan)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 05/16/2019. (CAT)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 05/16/2019. (CAT)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by Donna L Forsythe. (Lee, Alan)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 05/16/2019. (CAT)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : Please file the Civil Cover Sheet using the event Supplement found under Other Documents, and link it back to the Complaint. Requirements due by 5/21/2019. (CAT)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Buffaloe & Vallejo, PLC, First Financial Investment Fund Holdings, LLC, First Financial Investment Fund VI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons First Financial Investment Fund Holdings, LLC, #2 Summons First Financial Investment Fund VI, LLC) (CAT)
May 16, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (CAT)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3973723.), filed by Donna L Forsythe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Alias Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Sworn Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Authentication, #4 Exhibit 4 - Bill of Sale, #5 Exhibit 5 - Experian CR, #6 Summons - All Defendants)(Lee, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forsythe v. First Financial Investment Fund Holdings, LLC et al (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Financial Investment Fund Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Glenn R Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffaloe & Vallejo, PLC
Represented By: Glenn R Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Financial Investment Fund VI, LLC
Represented By: Glenn R Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna L Forsythe
Represented By: Alan C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna L. Forsythe
Represented By: Alan C Lee
Represented By: Brent S Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?