Motto Jr v. Mullins et al (TV3)

Plaintiff: Frank John Motto Jr
Defendant: Elaine L Chao, Maj. Cheryl Sanders, Donald Trump, Col Dereck Stewart, Lt Robert Greer, Officer Vince Mullins and Governor Bill Lee
Case Number: 2:2019cv00081
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant, Vince Mullins, has filed a Motion for an extension of time to file a responsive pleading to an amended complaint that has not been filed yet [Doc. 29]. Apparently, Plaintiff's counsel has advised defense counsel that he intends to amend his complaint shortly. Defendant requests additional time to respond after the amended complaint is filed. Defendant's response to the Complaint was due on July 15, 2019. The Motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff has neither amended his complaint nor requested court leave to do so at the present time. It would be premature for the Court to grant an extension of time to allow Defendant to respond to a potential pleading, and the Court declines to do so. The Court will, however, extend the time for Defendant to respond to the Complaint to July 29, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 07/17/2019. (CAT)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/13/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/16/19. (ABF)
July 15, 2019 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Vince Mullins. (Murphy, Meghan)
July 2, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Murphy on behalf of Vince Mullins (Murphy, Meghan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward L Kershaw on behalf of Frank John Motto Jr (Kershaw, Edward)
June 24, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Robert Greer, Bill Lee, Cheryl Sanders, Dereck Stewart. (Murphy, Meghan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Robert Greer, Bill Lee, Cheryl Sanders, Dereck Stewart. (Murphy, Meghan)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant, Colonel Dereck Stewart, has filed a Motion for an extension of time to file a response to the Plaintiff's Complaint [Doc. 23]. The Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall have to and including June 24, 2019, in which to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 05/28/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Frank John Motto Jr) (CAT)
May 24, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Dereck Stewart. (Murphy, Meghan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Murphy on behalf of Dereck Stewart (Murphy, Meghan)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants, Major Cheryl Sanders, Lieutenant Robert Greer and Governor Bill Lee, have filed a Motion for an extension of time to file a response to the Plaintiff's Complaint and responses to Plaintiff's Motions for a protective order and for discovery [Doc. 19]. The Motion for an extension of time to respond to the Complaint is GRANTED. Defendants shall have to and including June 24, 2019, in which to respond to the Complaint. Because the Court has denied Plaintiff's Motions for a protective order and for discovery, Defendants' Motion for extension of time to respond to said motions is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 05/23/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Frank John Motto Jr) (CAT)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Protective Order; denying #4 Motion for Discovery; denying #5 Motion for Advanced Notice of Hearing. Plaintiff is not entitled to such relief, particularly since he offers no basis for such entry of such an order. Accordingly, the Motion [Doc. 3] is DENIED. The Motion for discovery [Doc. 4] is DENIED. Plaintiff may endeavor to obtain discovery from Defendants via a method established in a Rule of Civil Procedure once discovery commences. Plaintiff seeks a special accommodation or method of service that the Clerk of the Court is not normally expected or required to provide. Accordingly, the Motion [Doc. 5] is DENIED. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 05/23/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Frank John Motto Jr) (CAT)
May 21, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION for Protective Order, #4 MOTION for Discovery by Robert Greer, Bill Lee, Cheryl Sanders. (Murphy, Meghan)
May 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Murphy on behalf of Robert Greer, Bill Lee, Cheryl Sanders (Murphy, Meghan)
May 21, 2019 Filing 17 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (JCK)(Copy of Notice mailed to Frank John Motto Jr.)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/21/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Frank John Motto Jr.)(JCK)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/21/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Frank John Motto Jr.)(JCK)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Governing Depositions, Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/21/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Frank John Motto Jr.)(JCK)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS re: #1 Complaint by Frank John Motto Jr. (Sealed Document 2 did not transfer correctly during case transfer process therefore these documents have been manually added)(JCK)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 6:19-cv-00129.
May 20, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to the Eastern District of Tennessee Northeastern (Greenville) Division. (gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion for Reconsideration re #8 Order of Transfer. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 5/16/2019. (gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order of Transfer by Frank John Motto Jr. (mjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Frank John Motto Jr as to #8 Order. (gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF TRANSFER re #1 Complaint filed by Frank John Motto Jr. This action is TRANSFERRED to the Northeastern (Greenville) Division of the Eastern District of Tennessee. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/18/2019. (gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Elaine L Chao, Robert Greer, Bill Lee, Vince Mullins, Cheryl Sanders, Dereck Stewart, Donald Trump, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) - Greer, #2 Summons(es) - Sanders, #3 Summons(es) - Chao, #4 Summons(es) - Stewart, #5 Summons(es) - Mullins, #6 Summons(es) - Trump)(gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2019.]
April 9, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Love (gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Advanced Notice of hearings by Frank John Motto. (gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2019.] Modified on 5/20/2019 to make motion pending(JCK).
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Discovery by Frank John Motto. (Attachments: #1 Request for Disclosure)(gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2019.] Modified on 5/20/2019 to make motion pending (JCK).
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Protective Order by Frank John Motto. (gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2019.] Modified on 5/20/2019 make motion pending(JCK).
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Frank John Motto. (Attachments: #1 Receipt of Payment, #2 Exhibit C - Drug/Alcohol Test)(gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motto Jr v. Mullins et al (TV3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine L Chao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maj. Cheryl Sanders
Represented By: Meghan Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Col Dereck Stewart
Represented By: Meghan Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Robert Greer
Represented By: Meghan Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Vince Mullins
Represented By: Meghan Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Bill Lee
Represented By: Meghan Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank John Motto Jr
Represented By: Edward L Kershaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?