Kova Bristol Tenn 1894, LLC v. Bristol Preservation, LLC (TV2)

Plaintiff: KOVA Bristol TENN 1894, LLC
Defendant: Bristol Preservation, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00084
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hobbs, Lindsey)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Kova Bristol Tenn 1894, LLC.(Hobbs, Lindsey)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 8/18/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/11/2020 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/24/19. (ABF)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT TO MAGISTRATE by Bristol Preservation, LLC (Tarwater, Dwight)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Nonconsent) (JCK)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 Bristol Preservattion, LLC ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Kova Bristol Tenn 1894, LLC by Bristol Preservation, LLC.(Tarwater, Dwight)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Bristol Preservation, LLC. (Tarwater, Dwight)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kova Bristol Tenn 1894, LLC. Bristol Preservation, LLC served on 5/24/2019. (Hobbs, Lindsey)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bristol Preservation, LLC. (BDG)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/24/2019. (BDG)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/24/2019. (BDG)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/24/2019. (BDG)
May 24, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (BDG)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by KOVA Bristol TENN 1894, LLC identifying Corporate Parent KOVA Golf Management, LLC for KOVA Bristol TENN 1894, LLC. (Hobbs, Lindsey)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bristol Preservation, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3980622.), filed by KOVA Bristol TENN 1894, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons to Bristol Preservation, LLC)(Hobbs, Lindsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kova Bristol Tenn 1894, LLC v. Bristol Preservation, LLC (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol Preservation, LLC
Represented By: Dwight E Tarwater
Represented By: Adam R Duggan
Represented By: Gregory P Isaacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KOVA Bristol TENN 1894, LLC
Represented By: Lindsey Lovingood Hobbs
Represented By: William A Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?