Wood v. Walmart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Timothy Wood
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,
Case Number: 2:2019cv00087
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/27/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 300 - Greeneville before Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker. The estimated length of trial is three (3) days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2020 at 1:30 PM. Dispositive Motions due by 5/29/2020. See Order for additional dates and details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 07/23/2019. (AMP)
July 16, 2019 Filing 19 Administrative Notice to Counsel #17 Pretrial Disclosure : Please refer to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(d) regarding the filing of initial disclosures. (AMP)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order and Stipulation filed by Walmart, Inc.., As evidenced by the signatures below of the parties' lawyers, it appears to the Court that Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, is the proper defendant in this matter. It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, is hereby substituted for Walmart, Inc. as the proper defendant in this action. It is further ORDERED that Walmart, Inc. is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 7/15/2019. (JCK)
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE by Timothy Wood.(East, George)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AGREED ORDER re #14 Joint Motion for the Release of Plaintiff's Records. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 07/15/2019. (CAT)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order and Stipulation by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Agreed Order and Stipulation)(de Quesada, Maria)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order for the Release of Plaintiff's Records by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Agreed Order for the Release of Plaintiff's Records)(de Quesada, Maria)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (de Quesada, Maria)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: A scheduling conference will be conducted on Monday, July 22, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. in the Court's chambers at the United States Courthouse, Greeneville, Tennessee. Counsel for the Defendant may appear telephonically by calling chambers at the appointed time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 07/02/2019. (AMP)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/2/19. (JBR)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 Administrative Notice to Counsel #9 Notice of Consent/Nonconsent : Please refile the Notice of Consent in a non-fillable form. Requirements due by 7/8/2019. (AMP)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CONSENT by Walmart, Inc. (de Quesada, Maria)
June 25, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 9/15/2020 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Jury Trial reset for 9/22/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. All unexpired scheduling deadlines shall be applied as calculated from the new trial date and according to the same time limitations set forth in the Court's original Scheduling Order [Doc. 8].(JAN)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: A final pretrial conference will be held in Knoxville on Tuesday, August 18, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. The trial of this case will be held in Knoxville before the undersigned with a jury beginning on Tuesday, August 25, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on June 24, 2019. (AYB)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 06/04/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AMP)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart, Inc..(de Quesada, Maria)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 05/29/2019. (AMP)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 05/29/2019. (AMP)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 05/29/2019. (AMP)
May 29, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (AMP)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Walmart, Inc.. (de Quesada, Maria)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Sullivan County, case number C42589 (M). (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3984072), filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Summons, #3 Exhibit B-Complaint, #4 Other Notice of filing to state court)(de Quesada, Maria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Wood
Represented By: George T East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: George A Rowlett
Represented By: Maria T de Quesada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,
Represented By: George A Rowlett
Represented By: Maria T de Quesada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?