Castle v. Kingsport Publishing Corporation (TV3)
Plaintiff: Brian Castle
Defendant: Kingsport Publishing Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00092
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Kingsport Publishing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wilcox, Deborah)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: On July 16, 2019, parties filed a Second Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint [Doc. 16] pursuant to Local Rule 12.1, which requires any extension of time beyond an initial extension to be approved by order of the Court. Parties agreed that Defendant shall have an extension of time up to and including August 1, 2019 to serve its response to Plaintiff's complaint. This stipulation is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 07/19/2019. (CAT)
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION Second Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Kingsport Publishing Corporation. (Wilcox, Deborah)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/20/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2020 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/16/19. (ABF)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Defendant has filed a Motion for admission of Lisa Bollinger Gehman, Esq., pro hac vice in this action [Doc. 13]. The Motion is GRANTED. Counsel MUST register immediately as a CM/ECF user in this district. The registration form can be found at the Court's website, www.tned.uscourts.gov, under For Attorneys and Electronic Case Filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 07/10/2019.(Copy of Order mailed to Lisa Bollinger Gehman) (CAT)
July 9, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for Lisa Bollinger Gehman regarding document: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00 Receipt Number G2011698) filed by Kingsport Publishing Corporation. (CAT)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lisa Bollinger Gehman (Filing fee $ 90.00 Receipt number G2011698) by Kingsport Publishing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Envelope) (CAT)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Defendant has filed a Motion for admission of Deborah A. Wilcox, Esq., pro hac vice in this action [Doc. 9]. The Motion is GRANTED. Counsel MUST register immediately as a CM/ECF user in this district. The registration form can be found at the Court's website, www.tned.uscourts.gov, under For Attorneys and Electronic Case Filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 06/28/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Deborah Wilcox) (CAT)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney Lisa Gehman is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Lisa Gehman) (CAT)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Kingsport Publishing Corporation. (CAT)
June 27, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for Deborah Wilcox regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G2011677) filed by Kingsport Publishing Corporation (CAT)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G2011677) by Kingsport Publishing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (CAT)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Plaintiff has filed a Motion for admission of Richard Liebowitz, Esq., pro hac vice in this action [Doc. 2]. The Motion is GRANTED. Counsel MUST register immediately as a CM/ECF user in this district. The registration form can be found at the Court's website, www.tned.uscourts.gov, under For Attorneys and Electronic Case Filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 06/04/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Richard Liebowitz) (CAT)
June 4, 2019 AO 121 mailed to the Register of Copyrights (AYB)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on June 4, 2019. (AYB)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on June 4, 2019. (AYB)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on June 4, 2019. (AYB)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kingsport Publishing Corporation. (AYB)
June 4, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Liebowitz's certificate of good standing is older than 30 days, however, a check of the New York State Unified Court System found no record of public discipline. (AYB)
June 3, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (AYB)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Brian Castle Of Filing Copyright Action (Hudson, Seth)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3987785.) by Brian Castle. (Hudson, Seth)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kingsport Publishing Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3987666.), filed by Brian Castle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Castle Photograph of Construction Site, #2 Exhibit B - Kingsport Article, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Hudson, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castle v. Kingsport Publishing Corporation (TV3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingsport Publishing Corporation
Represented By: Lisa Bollinger Gehman
Represented By: Deborah A Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Castle
Represented By: Seth Lee Hudson
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?