CamCal Enterprises, LLC v. Bokern et al
Plaintiff: CamCal Enterprises, LLC d/b/a BottleKeeper and CamCal Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Brett Bokern and Papa's This and That
Case Number: 2:2019cv00096
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: M Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CamCal Enterprises, LLC. Papa's This and That served on 6/26/2019. (Whitt, William)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CamCal Enterprises, LLC. Brett Bokern served on 6/26/2019. (Whitt, William)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 , #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorneys Gregory Phillip Sitrick and Otto Edwin Hinks. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 6/18/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Otto E. Hinks)(JCK)
June 17, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for attorneys Otto Edwin Hinks and Gregory Phillip Sitrick regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Otto Edwin Hinks ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3997950.) filed by CamCal Enterprises, LLC, #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gregory Phillip Sitrick ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3997943.) filed by CamCal Enterprises, LLC (JCK)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Otto Edwin Hinks ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3997950.) by CamCal Enterprises, LLC. (Whitt, William)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gregory Phillip Sitrick ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3997943.) by CamCal Enterprises, LLC. (Whitt, William)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 PATENT AND TRADEMARK NOTICE in compliance with 35 USC 290 and/or 15 USC 1116 regarding VA2-150-113 AO 121 - Copyright Notice. (Whitt, William)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 PATENT AND TRADEMARK NOTICE in compliance with 35 USC 290 and/or 15 USC 1116 regarding 4,603,083; 9,505,527; 9,637,270; 10,118,735 . (Whitt, William)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 6/10/2019. (JCK)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 6/10/2019. (JCK)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 6/10/2019. (JCK)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 Administrative Notice to Counsel, Please file the required forms for patent, trademark and copyright cases per LR3.1.1. Requirements due by 6/17/2019. (JCK)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Attorneys Gregory P. Sitrick and Otto E. Hinks are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Otto E Hinks)(JCK)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #1 Complaint. Informational only, for future reference, please do not input addresses when adding parties, file summons and the civil cover sheet in a non fillable format and file the Corporate Disclosure Statement separately, using the event Certificate of Corporate Interest. (JCK)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brett Bokern, Papa's This and That. (Attachments: #1 Summons Papa's This and That)(JCK)
June 10, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (JCK)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brett Bokern, Papa's This and That ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3993221.), filed by CamCal Enterprises, LLC d/b/a BottleKeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DMCA Counter Notice, #2 Exhibit B - BottleKeeper.com, #3 Exhibit C - BottleKeeper Spec Image Copyright, #4 Exhibit D - BottleKeeper_Amazon Listing, #5 Exhibit E - PapasThisandThat Web Captures, #6 Exhibit F - BottleKeeper Mark, #7 Exhibit G - 527 Patent, #8 Exhibit H - 270 Patent, #9 Exhibit I - 735 Patent, #10 Exhibit J - Papas Receipt, #11 Exhibit K - 527 Claim Chart, #12 Exhibit L - C&D Letter to Papas and Follow-Up Communications, #13 Exhibit M - 270 Claim Chart, #14 Exhibit N - 735 Claim Chart, #15 Summons Brett Bokern, #16 Summons Papa' This and That, #17 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #18 Other Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Whitt, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CamCal Enterprises, LLC v. Bokern et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CamCal Enterprises, LLC d/b/a BottleKeeper
Represented By: William Paul Whitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CamCal Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: William Paul Whitt
Represented By: Gregory P Sitrick
Represented By: Otto E Hinks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Bokern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papa's This and That
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?