Tester v. Walmart, Inc. (JRG3)
Plaintiff: Billy Tester
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores, East, LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv00104
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, In light of Judge Clifton L. Corker's recent elevation from United States Magistrate Judge to United States District Judge, the Court's Referral Order [Doc. 15] is hereby VACATED. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/14/2019. (JCK)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: In light of Judge Corker's recent elevation from magistrate judge to district judge, the Court sets a telephonic status conference on Tuesday, August 13, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. to discuss the parties' consent to a magistrate judge in this case. Counsel shall initiate a phone call with one another before jointly contacting the Court's chambers at (423) 787-7400. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 08/08/2019. (AMP)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 VACATED per Order doc. 17 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/31/2019. (JCK) Modified on 8/14/2019 (JCK).
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (de Quesada, Maria)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CONSENT by Wal-Mart Stores, East, LP (de Quesada, Maria)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order and Stipulation filed by Walmart, Inc., It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, is hereby substituted for Walmart, Inc. as the proper defendant in this action. It is further ORDERED that Walmart, Inc. is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 7/9/2019. (JCK)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AGREED ORDER re #9 Motion Entry of Agreed Order for the Release of Plaintiff's Records. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 07/09/2019. (AMP)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order and Stipulation by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Agreed Order and Stipulation)(de Quesada, Maria)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order for the Release of Plaintiff's Records by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Agreed Order for the Release of Plaintiff's Records)(de Quesada, Maria)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 6/28/2019. (JCK)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 06/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent / Non Consent) (CAT)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart, Inc..(de Quesada, Maria)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 6/21/2019. (DJH)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 6/21/2019. (DJH)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 6/21/2019. (DJH)
June 21, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (DJH)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Walmart, Inc.. (de Quesada, Maria)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Carter County, case number C14524. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4004505), filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Summons, #3 Exhibit B-Complaint, #4 Other Notice of filing to state court)(de Quesada, Maria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tester v. Walmart, Inc. (JRG3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Tester
Represented By: Thomas C Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Maria T de Quesada
Represented By: George A Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, East, LP
Represented By: Maria T de Quesada
Represented By: George A Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?